Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022152905 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19159938 | 28.02.2019 | WO2020EP55262 | 28.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3930982 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19159938 | 28.02.2019 | WO2020EP55262 | 28.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020174081 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19159938 | 28.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3702126 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19159938 | 28.02.2019 |