EP3927432 - ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harbour Antibodies BV CIC Rotterdam Groothandelsgebouw Stationsplein 45, Unit A4.004 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | For all designated states Universiteit Utrecht Holding B.V. Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | For all designated states Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSVELD, Franklin Gerardus HARBOUR ANTIBODIES BV CIC Rotterdam, Groothandelsgebouw Stationsplein 45, Unit A4.004 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
VAN HAPEREN, Marinus Johannes HARBOUR ANTIBODIES BV CIC Rotterdam, Groothandelsgebouw Stationsplein 45, Unit A4.004 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | 03 /
DRABEK, Dubravka HARBOUR ANTIBODIES BV CIC Rotterdam, Groothandelsgebouw Stationsplein 45, Unit A4.004 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | 04 /
BOSCH, Berend Jan UNIVERSITEIT UTRECHT HOLDING B.V Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 05 /
WIDJAJA, Ivy UNIVERSITEIT UTRECHT HOLDING B.V Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 06 /
WANG, Chunyan UNIVERSITEIT UTRECHT HOLDING B.V Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 07 /
VAN DIEREN, Brenda UNIVERSITEIT UTRECHT HOLDING B.V Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 08 /
LI, Wentao UNIVERSITEIT UTRECHT HOLDING B.V Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 09 /
VAN KUPPEVELD, Frank J.M. UNIVERSITEIT UTRECHT HOLDING B.V Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 10 /
HAAGMANS, Bart L. ERASMUS UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER ROTTERDAM Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | 11 /
OKBA, Nisreen M.A. ERASMUS UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER ROTTERDAM Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
GROSVELD, Franklin Gerardus 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | ||
02 /
VAN HAPEREN, Marinus Johannes 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | |||
03 /
DRABEK, Dubravka 3013 AK Rotterdam / NL | |||
04 /
BOSCH, Berend Jan 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | |||
05 /
WIDJAJA, Ivy 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | |||
06 /
WANG, Chunyan 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | |||
07 /
VAN DIEREN, Brenda 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | |||
08 /
LI, Wentao 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | |||
09 /
VAN KUPPEVELD, Frank J.M. 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | |||
10 /
HAAGMANS, Bart L. 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | |||
11 /
OKBA, Nisreen M.A. 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20707586.2 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020EP54521 | Priority number, date | EP20190382123 | 20.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19382123 | EP20190382869 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19382869 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020169755 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3927432 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61P31/14, C07K16/10 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61P31/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/10 (CN);
A61K47/00 (US);
C07K16/08 (US);
C07K16/1002 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (CN,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER | [2021/52] | English: | ANTIBODIES | [2021/52] | French: | ANTICORPS | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2015164865 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [XDA]WO2015179535 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]); | [XAYI]WO2016138160 (US HEALTH [US]); | by applicant | WO9364701 | US3773919 | US4485045 | US4522811 | US4544545 | US4676980 | US4816567 | US5013556 | US5030719 | WO9411026 | WO9522618 | US5916771 | WO9953049 | WO2005103081 | WO2006008548 | WO2007096779 | WO2010070263 | WO2010109165 | WO2014141189 | WO2014141192 | WO2015017953 | WO2015179535 | WO1995US02140 |