EP3911652 - IMIDAZO[1,2-A]PYRIDINYL DERIVATIVES AS IRAK4 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPKINS, Brian, T. c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
PFAFFENBACH, Magnus c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
MAY-DRACKA, Tricia c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
EVANS, Ryan c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
GAO, Fang c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
ENYEDY, Istvan c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
XIN, Zhili c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 08 /
BOLDUC, Philippe c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 09 /
PETERSON, Emily, Anne c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
HOPKINS, Brian, T. Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
02 /
PFAFFENBACH, Magnus Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
03 /
MAY-DRACKA, Tricia Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
04 /
EVANS, Ryan Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
05 /
GAO, Fang Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
06 /
ENYEDY, Istvan Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
07 /
XIN, Zhili Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
08 /
BOLDUC, Philippe Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
09 /
PETERSON, Emily, Anne Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20707888.2 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US14126 | Priority number, date | US201962794098P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794098 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150626 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911652 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/437, A61K31/4985, A61K31/519, A61P9/00, A61P25/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | 13.08.2021 | ME | 13.08.2021 | Validation states | KH | 13.08.2021 | MA | 13.08.2021 | MD | 13.08.2021 | TN | 13.08.2021 | Title | German: | IMIDAZO[1,2-A]PYRIDINYLDERIVATE ALS IRAK4-INHIBITOREN | [2021/47] | English: | IMIDAZO[1,2-A]PYRIDINYL DERIVATIVES AS IRAK4 INHIBITORS | [2021/47] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'IMIDAZO[1,2-A]PYRIDINYLE SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS D'IRAK4 | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 13.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008200494 (KISHINO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 2,5,30,31,37-41 * tables 1-3, 6; examples 9, 10, 17, 21, 26-28, 30, 33, 60, 65;; claims 20, 36, 37 *; | [XA]WO2014209841 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 2,5,30,31,37 * examples A.5-A.7, 14, 32, 36, 40, 41, 44, 64-73;; claims 1, 31, 32 * [A] 1; | [A]WO2015104688 (AURIGENE DISCOVERY TECH LTD [IN]) [A] 1-41 * example -; claims 1, 2, 16-23 *; | [XA]WO2015197503 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 2,5,30,31,37 * examples D.1-D.3, 1, 2, 28, 47;; claims 1, 48, 49 * [A] 1; | [E]WO2020035020 (ZHEJIANG HISUN PHARM CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-41 * example -; claims 1-10 *; | [A] - W. MICHAEL SEGANISH, "Inhibitors of interleukin-1 receptor-associated kinase 4 (IRAK4): a patent review (2012-2015)", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, (2016), vol. 26, no. 8, doi:10.1080/13543776.2016.1202926, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 917 - 932, XP055308579 [A] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13543776.2016.1202926 | [X] - ESPÉRANCE MOINE ET AL, "A small-molecule cell-based screen led to the identification of biphenylimidazoazines with highly potent and broad-spectrum anti-apicomplexan activity", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2015), vol. 89, doi:10.1016/j.ejmech.2014.10.057, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 386 - 400, XP055585794 [X] 2,5,30,37 * page 389, table 1, compound Ttou269 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2014.10.057 | [XA] - EMMANUEL PINARD ET AL, "Discovery of a Novel Class of Survival Motor Neuron 2 Splicing Modifiers for the Treatment of Spinal Muscular Atrophy", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2017), vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.7b00406, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4444 - 4457, XP055614701 [X] 2,5,30,31,37 * compounds 14, 15, 45, 48, 49, 51 * [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.7b00406 | by applicant | WO2004078163 | WO2018065962 | - COHEN, Current Opinion in Cell Biology, (20090000), vol. 21, pages 1 - 8 | - RINGWOODLI, Cytokine, (20080000), vol. 42, pages 1 - 7 | - CAO et al., Science, (19960000), vol. 271, no. 5252, pages 1128 - 31 | - MUZIO et al., Science, (19970000), vol. 278, no. 5343, pages 1612 - 5 | - WESCHE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, no. 27, pages 19403 - 10 | - LI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 5567 - 5572 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Company, (19900000), pages 1289 - 1329 | - T. KOUTSOKERAST. HEALY, "Systemic lupus erythematosus and lupus nephritis", Nat Rev Drug Discov, (20140000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 173 - 174 | - LOUIS F. FIESERMARY FIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, Wiley, (19670000), vol. 1-19 | - "Methoden der organischen Chemie", HOUBEN WEYL, Methods of Organic Chemistry, Georg Thieme Verlag, (19740000), vol. 15/1 |