EP3928484 - TENANT REPLICATION BOOTSTRAP FOR A MULTI-TENANT IDENTITY CLOUD SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Mail Stop 5OP7 Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Sudhir Kumar 1410 Cedarmeadow Ct. San Jose, California 95131 / US | 02 /
BALU, Balakumar 7004 Atlas Peak Drive Dublin, California 94065 / US | 03 /
MEDAM, Venkateswara Reddy 4205 Noah Ct. Modesto, California 95356 / US | 04 /
SHIH, Kuang-Yu 41236 Norman Ct. Fremont, California 94539 / US | 05 /
HO, Fannie 34277 Tupelo St. Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Sudhir Kumar San Jose, California 95131 / US | ||
02 /
BALU, Balakumar Dublin, California 94065 / US | |||
03 /
MEDAM, Venkateswara Reddy Modesto, California 95356 / US | |||
04 /
SHIH, Kuang-Yu Fremont, California 94539 / US | |||
05 /
HO, Fannie Fremont, California 94555 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20708262.9 | 21.01.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US14320 | Priority number, date | US201962807454P | 19.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962807454 P | US201916555107 | 29.08.2019 Original published format: US201916555107 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171902 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928484 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3928484 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F16/27, H04L67/1095, H04L67/02, H04L67/53, H04L67/10 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP);
G06F16/256 (US);
G06F16/1734 (US);
G06F16/1844 (US);
G06F9/4416 (US);
H04L63/0815 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
H04L67/53 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H04L29/06, G06F16/27, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANDANTENREPLIKATIONS-BOOTSTRAP FÜR EINEN MANDANTENFÄHIGEN CLOUD-IDENTITÄTSDIENST | [2021/52] | English: | TENANT REPLICATION BOOTSTRAP FOR A MULTI-TENANT IDENTITY CLOUD SERVICE | [2021/52] | French: | AMORÇAGE DE RÉPLICATION DE LOCATAIRE POUR UN SERVICE INFONUAGIQUE D'IDENTITÉ À MULTIPLES LOCATAIRES | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012303912 (CALDER BRADLEY GENE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0087] *; | [A]US9270546 (LEHMANN MARC [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,6 *; | [A]US2018075231 (SUBRAMANIAN ELANGOVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0208] * * paragraph [0027] * | by applicant | US2016092540 |