EP3920848 - REINFORCED REGENERATIVE HEART VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDOLOI GURUNATH, Ankita Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 02 /
SHANG, Hao Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 03 /
HAN, Jingjia Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
BORDOLOI GURUNATH, Ankita Irvine, CA 92614 / US | ||
02 /
SHANG, Hao Irvine, CA 92614 / US | |||
03 /
HAN, Jingjia Irvine, CA 92614 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20708898.0 | 30.01.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US15892 | Priority number, date | US201962800853P | 04.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962800853 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163150 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920848 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61L27/36, A61L27/38, A61L27/50 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A61F2/2412 (EP);
A61F2/2418 (US);
A61L27/18 (EP);
A61L27/3604 (EP);
A61L27/3625 (EP,US);
A61L27/3687 (US);
A61L27/3834 (EP,US);
A61L27/507 (EP);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (US);
A61F2220/0075 (US);
A61F2250/0067 (US);
A61F2250/0082 (EP,US);
A61L2300/414 (EP);
A61L2430/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (EP);
A61L27/18, C08L75/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE REGENERATIVE HERZKLAPPEN | [2021/50] | English: | REINFORCED REGENERATIVE HEART VALVES | [2021/50] | French: | VALVULES CARDIAQUES RÉGÉNÉRATRICES RENFORCÉES | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 06.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE19919625 (HOERSTRUP SIMON PHILIPP [CH], et al); | [XI]WO03096932 (BIONETHOS HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al); | [XI]DE10235237 (SYMETIS AG ZUERICH [CH]) | by applicant | US2015100118 |