07.08.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2024 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
12.05.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.03.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
29.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.11.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
10.11.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
10.11.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
15.09.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.05.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2022 |
First examination report |
|
22.09.2022 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
14.09.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.09.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.09.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
04.04.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.04.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
02.04.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
05.11.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.11.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
11.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
16.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|