Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3921850
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.04.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] |
08.04.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] |
26.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
12.11.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.11.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
18.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
01.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
14.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
16.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|