EP3921850 - BIOMARKER IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIC Innovations Group, Inc. 100 South Beford Road, Suite 340 Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLASNER, Daniel c/o AIC INNOVATIONS GROUP, INC. Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | 02 /
BARDSLEY, Ryan, Scott c/o AIC INNOVATIONS GROUP, INC. Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | 03 /
GALATZER-LEVY, Isaac c/o AIC INNOVATIONS GROUP, INC. Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | 04 /
ABBAS, Muhammad, Anzar c/o AIC INNOVATIONS GROUP, INC. Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
GLASNER, Daniel Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | ||
02 /
BARDSLEY, Ryan, Scott Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | |||
03 /
GALATZER-LEVY, Isaac Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | |||
04 /
ABBAS, Muhammad, Anzar Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20709102.6 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US17081 | Priority number, date | US201962802049P | 06.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962802049 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163645 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921850 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G16H50/30, A61B5/16, A61B5/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H10/20 (US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP);
A61B5/1101 (EP);
A61B5/1495 (EP);
A61B5/165 (EP,US);
A61B5/4082 (EP);
A61B5/4088 (US);
A61B5/4839 (EP);
A61B5/7257 (EP);
A61B5/7275 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06V40/176 (EP,US);
G10L15/08 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0204 (EP);
A61B2562/0219 (EP);
G10L2015/088 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | BIOMARKERIDENTIFIZIERUNG | [2021/50] | English: | BIOMARKER IDENTIFICATION | [2021/50] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE BIOMARQUEURS | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 01.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017069216 (VAUGHAN BRENT [US], et al) [X] 1,20 * The whole document, in particular: Paragraphs [0010], [0029], [0083] - [0091], [0119] - [0123]. *[I] 2-19,21-28; | [XI]US2017365101 (SAMEC NICOLE ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,14,17,20,22,23,27 * The whole document, in particular: Paragraphs [0007], [0019], [0030] - [0032], [0097], [0185], [0451], [0474] - [0482], [0488] - [0499], [0542] - [0550], [0567] - [0575], [0583], [0584], [0666], [0796], [0873]; Figures 9D, 10, 11. * [I] 3-6,11-13,15,16,18,19,21,24-26,28 | by applicant | US2019290127 | US2019290129 | US2019290128 | - GAO, C.SUN, H. et al., "Model-based and Model-free Machine Learning Techniques for Diagnostic Prediction and Classification of Clinical Outcomes in Parkinson's Disease", Scientific Reports, (20180000), vol. 8, page 7129 | - GOTTHEIL, E.THORNTON, C.EXLINE, R., "Appropriate and Background Affect in Facial Displays of Emotion Comparison of Normal and Schizophrenic Males", Arch Gen Psych, (19760000), vol. 33, no. 5 | - BERENBAUM, H.OLTMANNS T., "Emotional experience and expression in schizophrenia and depression", J. Abnorm. Psychol., (19920000), vol. 101, no. 1 | - KATSIKITIS, M.PILOWSKY, I., "A study of facial expression in Parkinson's disease using a novel microcomputer-based method", J Neurol. Neurosurg. Psychiatry, (19880000), vol. 51, no. 3 | - STACY, M.HAUSER, R., "Development of a Patient Questionnaire to facilitate recognition of motor and non-motor wearing-off in Parkinson's disease", Journal of Neural Transmission, (20070000), vol. 114, no. 2 | - SIDEROWF A.MCDERMOTT M.KIEBURTZ K.BLINDAUER K.PLUMB S.SHOULSON I., "Test-retest reliability of the unified Parkinson's disease rating scale in patients with early Parkinson's disease: results from a multicenter clinical trial", Mov. Disord., (20020000), vol. 17, no. 4 | - EKMAN, P.LEVENSON, R. W.FRIESEN, W. V., "Autonomic nervous system activity distinguishes among emotions", Science, (19830000), vol. 221, no. 4616 | - HO, A.BRADSHAW, J.IANSEK, R.ALFREDSON, R., "Speech volume regulation in Parkinson's disease: effects of implicit cues and explicit instructions", Neuropsychologia, (19990000), vol. 37, no. 13 | - BREZNITZ, Z., "Verbal indicators of depression", The Journal of general psychology, (19920000), vol. 119, no. 4 | - HAREL, B.CANNIZZARO, M.SNYDER, P., "Variability in fundamental frequency during speech in prodromal and incipient Parkinson's disease: A longitudinal case study", Brain and cognition, (20040000), vol. 56, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.bandc.2004.05.002, XP004566432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bandc.2004.05.002 | - SAXMAN, J.BURK, K., "Speaking fundamental frequency and rate characteristics of adult female schizophrenics", Journal of speech and hearing research, (19680000), vol. 11, no. 1 | - OZDAS, A.SHIAVI, R.SILVERMAN, S.SILVERMAN, M.WILKES, D., "Investigation of vocal jitter and glottal flow spectrum as possible cues for depression and near-term suicidal risk", IEEE Trans. Bio-Eng., (20040000), page 51 | - LITTLE, M.MCSHARRY, P.HUNTER, E.SPIELMAN, J.RAMIG, L., "Suitability of dysphonia measurements for telemonitoring of Parkinson's disease", Nature Precedings, (20080000), pages 1 - 1 | - MICHAELIS, D.GRAMSS, T.STRUBE, H.W., "Glottal-to-Noise Excitation Ratio - a New Measure for Describing Pathological Voices", Acustica, (19970000), page 83 | - TRIFU, R.NEMES, B.BODEA-HATEGAN, C.COZMAN, D., "Linguistic Indicators of Language in Major Depressive Disorder (MDD). An Evidence Based Research", Journal of Evidence-Based Psychotherapies, (20170000), vol. 17, no. 1 | - COZOLINO, L., "The oral and written productions of schizophrenic patients", Progress in Experimental Personality Research, (19830000), page 12 | - RUDE, S.DURHAM-FOWLER, J.BAUM, E.ROONEY, S.MAESTAS, K., "Self-report and cognitive processing measures of depressive thinking predict subsequent major depressive disorder", Cognitive Therapy and Research, (20100000), vol. 34, no. 2 | - CROISILE, B.SKA, B.BRABANT, M.DUCHENE, A.LEPAGE, Y.AIMARD, G.TRILLET, M., "Comparative study of oral and written picture description in patients with Alzheimer's disease", Brain and language, (19960000), vol. 53, no. 1, doi:10.1006/brln.1996.0033, XP002512589 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/brln.1996.0033 | - DELISI, L., "Speech disorder in schizophrenia: review of the literature and exploration of its relation to the uniquely human capacity for language", Schizophrenia bulletin, (20010000), vol. 27, no. 3 | - ALPERT, M.POUGET, E.SILVA, R., "Reflections of depression in acoustic measures of the patient's speech", Journal of affective disorders, (20010000), vol. 66, no. 1 | - SKODDA, S.SCHLEGEL, U., "Speech rate and rhythm in Parkinson's disease", Movement disorders: official journal of the Movement Disorder Society, (20080000), vol. 23, no. 7 | - RAPCAN, V.D'ARCY, S.YEAP, S.AFZAL, N.THAKORE, J.REILLY, R., "Acoustic and temporal analysis of speech: A potential biomarker for schizophrenia", Medical engineering & physics, vol. 32, no. 9, doi:10.1016/j.medengphy.2010.07.013, XP027509479 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.medengphy.2010.07.013 |