EP3924187 - ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUTCHKO, Cynthia 1405 Greendale Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | 02 /
CHIANG, Brian 33 Thorncrest Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15235 / US | 03 /
WILKINSON, Bryan W. 526 Penn Avenue, Apt. 301 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15222 / US | 04 /
EPSTEIN, Eric S. 54B Bethany Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15215 / US | 05 /
BUBAS, Michael A. 100 Glenn Avenue Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15215 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
KUTCHKO, Cynthia Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | ||
02 /
CHIANG, Brian Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15235 / US | |||
03 /
WILKINSON, Bryan W. Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15222 / US | |||
04 /
EPSTEIN, Eric S. Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15215 / US | |||
05 /
BUBAS, Michael A. Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15215 / US | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20709448.3 | 10.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US17455 | Priority number, date | US201962803664P | 11.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962803664 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020167638 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924187 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00, C08G18/10, C08G18/24, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/50, C08G18/61, C08G18/69, C08G18/75, C08L23/08 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
C08G18/755 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR);
C08G18/12 (US);
B29C64/106 (US);
C08G18/244 (EP);
C08G18/246 (US);
C08G18/3228 (US);
C08G18/3234 (EP,KR);
C08G18/4804 (US);
C08G18/4837 (US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,KR);
C08G18/5024 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/5036 (US);
C08G18/61 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/69 (EP,KR);
C08G77/16 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/0041 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3234 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/5024 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | ELASTOMERE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2021/51] | English: | ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2021/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ÉLASTOMÈRES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 07.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013237661 (BRUST THOMAS B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10-16,19 * pages 6-7;14, paragraphs 54-55, 58;132 - page 17; claims 3,4 *; | [A]WO2016085992 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [X]WO2018157148 (VOXEL8 INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,9,17,18,20-27 * page 2;37, lines 28-34;18-20 - pages 111-112; figures 1,2,4,7,15,16; example 8 * | by applicant | US8993691 | - NOOMEN, Proceedings of the XIIIth International Conference in Organic Coatings Science and Technology, (19870000), page 251 | - TILLET et al., Progress in Polymer Science, (20110000), vol. 36, pages 191 - 217 |