EP3927170 - MOVABLE MOULD MEMBER FOR MOULDING FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marel Further Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEULENDIJKS, Johannes Martinus 26, Kasteelhoeve 5754 HW DEURNE / NL | 02 /
DEKKER, Thomas Willem 20, Professor van Weliestraat 6524 NN NIJMEGEN / NL | 03 /
PETERS, Erik Hendrikus Werner 16, Bilderbeekstraat 5831 CX BOXMEER / NL | 04 /
VAN ZOELEN, Martinus Johannes Willebrordus 11, Graanakker 5236 VH 's-HERTOGENBOSCH / NL | 05 /
LE PAIH, Jacques c/o ZI du Dressève 56150 BAUD / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
MEULENDIJKS, Johannes Martinus 5754 HW DEURNE / NL | ||
02 /
DEKKER, Thomas Willem 6524 NN NIJMEGEN / NL | |||
03 /
PETERS, Erik Hendrikus Werner 5831 CX BOXMEER / NL | |||
04 /
VAN ZOELEN, Martinus Johannes Willebrordus 5236 VH 's-HERTOGENBOSCH / NL | |||
05 /
LE PAIH, Jacques 56150 BAUD / FR | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20709760.1 | 17.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020NL50090 | Priority number, date | NL20192022602 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: NL 2022602 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171697 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927170 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A22C7/00, A23P30/10 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A22C7/0069 (EP,US);
A22C7/0038 (US);
A23P30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHES FORMTEIL ZUM FORMEN VON LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTEN | [2021/52] | English: | MOVABLE MOULD MEMBER FOR MOULDING FOOD PRODUCTS | [2021/52] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE MOULE MOBILE POUR LE MOULAGE DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 25.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4957425 (FAY RUDOLPH J [US]) [X] 5,6,18,19,22-25 * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 37; figures 4A, 5, 6; claims 1,2,8 * [Y] 1-4,16,17; | [AD]WO2004002229 (STORK TITAN BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-6,16-19,22-25 * abstract *; | [A]WO2012012581 (FORMAX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6,16-19,21-25 * abstract * * page 35, line 3 - page 36, line 20 * * page 37, line 17 - page 38, line 15 * * page 59, line 22 - page 61, line 3; figure 35 * * page 31, line 22 - page 32, line 6 *; | [YA]WO2012107236 (GEA CFS BAKEL B V [NL], et al) [Y] 1-4,16,17 * page 13, paragraph 2; figures 3, 17; claims 1, 3, 11-16 * [A] 7-15,20; | [A]WO2014161947 (GEA FOOD SOLUTIONS BAKEL BV [NL]) [A] 21* page 1, paragraph 5 - page 2, paragraph 3; figures 1, 14 *; | [A]WO2018034568 (MAREL TOWNSEND FURTHER PROC BV [NL]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * | by applicant | US4418446 | WO2004002229 | WO2012161577 |