Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3953339

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 ISLapse: 04.01.2025
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NOLapse: 04.12.2024
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RSLapse: 04.12.2024
 SE 
 SI 
 SKLapse: 04.09.2024
 SMLapse: 04.09.2024
 TR 
Validation statesKH 
 MA 
 MD 
TN 
Examination procedure24.07.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase23.09.2021National basic fee paid 
23.09.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2021Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted04.09.2024
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.10.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:24.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:14.01.2022 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:14.01.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:16.02.2022 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20210923
 
Event date:16.02.2022 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:20.07.2022 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:20.07.2022 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:30.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 40068845 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:21.06.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230517
 
Event date:30.06.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:02.08.2023 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20230630
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:10.04.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:08.05.2024 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20240411
 
Event date:24.07.2024 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:02.08.2024 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:02.08.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:04.09.2024 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:04.09.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:13.09.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:26.09.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602020037033 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:09.10.2024 
Event description:REQUEST FOR UNITARY EFFECT FILED
Effective DATE:20240905
 
Event date:25.09.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:23.10.2024 
Event description:UNITARY EFFECT REGISTERED
Designated State(s):AT BE BG DE DK EE FI FR IT LT LU LV MT NL PT RO SE SI
Effective DATE:20240923
 
Event date:13.11.2024 
Event description:WITHDRAWAL OF OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Free Format Text:CASE NUMBER: APP_52478/2024
Effective DATE:20240918
 
Event date:27.11.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20240402425 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20241111
 
Event date:02.12.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2991081 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20241202
 
Event date:19.03.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20241374T HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:20.12.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20241374 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:08.01.2025 
Event description:WITHDRAWAL OF OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) CHANGED
Free Format Text:CASE NUMBER: APP_52478/2024
Effective DATE:20240923
 
Event date:14.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20241204
 
Event date:28.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20241204
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20241204
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20241204
 
Event date:28.02.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E068975 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:28.03.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20241374 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20250307
Year of Fee Payment:6
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20250104
 
Event date:11.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20250307
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:15.04.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240904
 
Event date:17.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20250306
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:22.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20250327
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20250331
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:25.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20250307
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:28.04.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240904
 
Event date:28.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20250327
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:30.04.2025 
Event description:RENEWAL FEE FOR THE EUROPEAN PATENT WITH UNITARY EFFECT PAID
Year of Fee Payment:06
Effective DATE:20250327
 
Event date:30.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20250311
Year of Fee Payment:06