Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3924993 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2020223027 CA3129830 CN202080022002 EP20711399 KR20217029290 US2020017993W US202016789324 US202217689350 US202318235571



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12237689Global Dossier 25.02.2025B2
US2023396069 07.12.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201962804457 12.02.2019
US202318235571 18.08.2023
US202016789324 12.02.2020
US202217689350 08.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11770006Global Dossier 26.09.2023B2
US2022216697 07.07.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962804457 12.02.2019
US202016789324 12.02.2020
US202217689350 08.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11342754Global Dossier 24.05.2022B2
US2020259336 13.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962804457 12.02.2019
US202016789324 12.02.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20210120107Global Dossier 06.10.2021A
Priority number Date
WO2020US17993 12.02.2020
US201962804457 12.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113597658Global Dossier 02.11.2021A
Priority number Date
WO2020US17993 12.02.2020
US201962804457 12.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3129830Global Dossier 20.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
WO2020US17993 12.02.2020
US201962804457 12.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2020223027Global Dossier 23.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2020US17993 12.02.2020
US201962804457 12.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3924993Global Dossier 22.12.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2020US17993 12.02.2020
US201962804457 12.02.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020168001Global Dossier 20.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962804457 12.02.2019