EP3952680 - AEROSOL-GENERATING SYSTEM AND AEROSOL-GENERATING ARTICLE COMPRISING AN AEROSOL-GENERATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products, S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPELLI, Sébastien Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
DAYIOGLU, Onur Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
VOLLMER, Jean-Yves Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Millburn, Julie Elizabeth Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20711593.2 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020EP57516 | Priority number, date | EP20190168001 | 08.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19168001 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020207734 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952680 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, A24D1/20, A24F40/50, A24F40/42 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A24D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/50 (EP,KR);
A24F40/30 (US);
A24B15/16 (KR);
A24B15/167 (US);
A24D1/18 (KR);
A24F40/20 (KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR);
A24F40/46 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/465 (US);
A24F40/57 (US);
H02M1/0003 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND AEROSOLERZEUGENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINER AEROSOLERZEUGENDEN FOLIE | [2022/07] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING SYSTEM AND AEROSOL-GENERATING ARTICLE COMPRISING AN AEROSOL-GENERATING FILM | [2022/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET ARTICLE DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL COMPRENANT UN FILM DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 21.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5060671 (COUNTS MARY E [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * column 2, lines 44-48; figures 3,4,7a-7k * * column 3, lines 1-26 * * column 3, lines 46-52 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, lines 39-43 * * column 6, lines 3-18; figure 7a * * column 5, lines 14-18 * * column 7, lines 23-39 *; | [A]EP0703735 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]) [A] 4,12 * paragraphs [0050] , [0052]; figures 11-13 *; | [A]EP0822760 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0048] , [0054] , [0062] , [0065] , [0067] , [0069]; figures 1-3,4a *; | [A]US2017318862 (MIRONOV OLEG [CH], et al) [A] 12* paragraphs [0076] , [0077]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2017207581 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 14,15 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 4 * | by applicant | US5060671 |