Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022186096 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 | WO2020EP57934 | 23.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210149041 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 | WO2020EP57934 | 23.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3733728 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117362576 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 | WO2020EP57934 | 23.03.2020 | CN202080026422 | 23.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113677727B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2023 | B | CN113677727 | 19.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 | WO2020EP57934 | 23.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111748075 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3947494 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 | WO2020EP57934 | 23.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020200867 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19171742 | 30.04.2019 | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 |