EP3947494 - AQUEOUS POLYURETHANE-UREA DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Chen Room 2307, Building 7, Lane 6 Zhong Shan Eighth Road Guangzhou, Guangdong, 510150 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Yingdan Chengli Road, Lane 298, Number 15, Room 502 Pudong Shanghai, 201210 / CN | 03 /
AVTOMONOV, Evgeny Lurchenweg 6 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
JIN, Chen Guangzhou, Guangdong, 510150 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHU, Yingdan Shanghai, 201210 / CN | |||
03 /
AVTOMONOV, Evgeny 51375 Leverkusen / DE | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20711952.0 | 23.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP57934 | Priority number, date | CN201910256347 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910256347 | EP20190171742 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19171742 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020200867 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947494 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/12, C08G18/32, C08G18/38, C08G18/42, C08G18/66, C08G18/72, C08G18/73, C08G18/75, C09J175/06 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C08G18/4238 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,KR);
C08G18/6655 (CN);
C09J175/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/0828 (EP,KR);
C08G18/12 (EP,KR);
C08G18/3206 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/3271 (CN,KR);
C08G18/3275 (KR);
C08G18/3857 (KR);
C08G18/4202 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,KR);
C08G18/6674 (US);
C08G18/73 (EP,KR);
C08G18/758 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3271 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3275 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3857 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE POLYURETHAN-HARNSTOFF-DISPERSION | [2022/06] | English: | AQUEOUS POLYURETHANE-UREA DISPERSION | [2022/06] | French: | DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE POLYURÉTHANE-URÉE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 29.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1283236 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,9-12,14,15 * pages 21-23, paragraphs 202,208-209,213-216 - page 26, paragraph 233 *; | [A]WO2017114835 (COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018114838 (COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2018227645 (WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, lines 18-19; page 20, claim7; page 1;7, paragraph 0001 - page 10; example 1; claims 1,7 * | by applicant | EP0304718 | US4870129 | US6017997 | US8557387 | - H BARTLJ. FALBE, Methoden der organischen Chemie, Houben-Weyl, (19870000), vol. E20, pages 1671 - 1682 |