EP3921089 - APPLICATION NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco IAS GmbH Gewerbestrasse 52 75015 Bretten / DE | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BITZEL, Heiko Ludwig Wilhelm Straße 20 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
ECKSTEIN, Sergej Karl-Friedrich-Schlafer-Straße 23 75180 Pforzheim / DE | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
BITZEL, Heiko 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
ECKSTEIN, Sergej 75180 Pforzheim / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Rheinstraße 19 76532 Baden-Baden / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20712289.6 | 16.03.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP57098 | Priority number, date | DE201910113896 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019113896 | DE201920104322U | 06.08.2019 Original published format: DE 202019104322 U | [2021/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239283 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921089 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3921089 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/02, B05B1/04 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
B05B1/044 (EP,KR,US);
B05C5/0254 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFTRAGSDÜSE | [2021/50] | English: | APPLICATION NOZZLE | [2021/50] | French: | BUSE D'APPLICATION | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23172475.8 / EP4234094 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4201534 (PHIPPS ARTHUR L [US]); | [A]DE102006012373 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]JP5095829B ; | [A]US2014203115 (KRAFT BERND [DE], et al); | [XAI]US2017036243 (VOLPATO MARCO [IT], et al); | [A]DE102016010223 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]DE102017101336 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]); | [A]DE102017103329 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE102016014271 |