EP3947497 - METHACRYLATE MONOMER-BASED COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bostik SA 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHAUD, Guillaume Bostik SA ZAC du bois de Plaisance 101, rue du Champ Cailloux 60280 VENETTE / FR | 02 /
BOUTEILLE, Aurelie Bostik SA ZAC du bois de Plaisance, 101 rue du Champ Cailloux 60280 VENETTE / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MICHAUD, Guillaume 60280 VENETTE / FR | ||
02 /
BOUTEILLE, Aurelie 60280 VENETTE / FR | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20712377.9 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP58296 | Priority number, date | FR20190003224 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1903224 | [2022/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193604 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947497 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/22, C08G18/67, C08G18/76, C08L75/14, C09J175/14, C08F283/00, C08G18/48, C08L75/16, C09J175/16, C08F290/04 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
C08F290/067 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/227 (EP);
C08G18/4825 (EP);
C08G18/7657 (US);
C08G18/7671 (EP);
C08L75/14 (EP);
C08L75/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/067, C08F220/20, C08F220/282 (EP);
C08G18/672, C08G18/4825 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | METHACRYLATMONOMERBASIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/06] | English: | METHACRYLATE MONOMER-BASED COMPOSITION | [2022/06] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE DE MONOMERE METHACRYLATE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002058146 (SCHWALM REINHOLD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,12-18 * paragraph [0038]; example 11; table 2 * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]EP1609831 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18* paragraphs [0004] , [0068]; tables 1-2 *; | [XY]WO2013017350 (EVONIK ROEHM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, lines 17-20; claims 1-13 * * page 3, lines 11-21 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 6 * * page 6, lines 3-15 * * page 9, lines 8-14 * [Y] 1-18; | [X]WO2013185993 (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 6; claims 1, 4-13 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 14 * * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 4 * * page 14, lines 4-19 * | by applicant | FR1591172 |