blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3784064

EP3784064 - A PACKAGING MATERIAL AND AN ORAL POUCHED NICOTINE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.04.2021
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.01.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.09.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.03.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2024Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swedish Match North Europe AB
118 85 Stockholm / SE
[2021/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BODIN, Cristian
Ekollonvägen 162
443 50 Lerum / SE
 [2021/09]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2021/09]
Application number, filing date20712501.416.03.2020
[2021/09]
WO2020EP57022
Priority number, dateSE2019005033118.03.2019         Original published format: SE 1950331
[2021/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020187812
Date:24.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3784064
Date:03.03.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3784064
Date:02.06.2021
Language:EN
[2021/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.2020
ClassificationIPC:A24B13/00, A24B15/16, A24B15/38, D04H1/425, D04H1/58
[2023/52]
CPC:
D04H1/425 (EP,KR,SE); B65B29/028 (KR,SE); A24F23/02 (KR,SE,US);
A24B13/00 (EP,KR,SE,US); A24B15/16 (EP,KR,US); A24B15/385 (EP,KR);
B29C65/08 (KR); D04H1/58 (EP,KR); D04H1/64 (KR,SE);
B65B9/08 (KR,SE); D04H1/54 (KR,SE) (-)
Former IPC [2021/09]A24B13/00, D04H1/425, D04H1/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL UND ORALES NIKOTINBEUTELPRODUKT[2021/09]
English:A PACKAGING MATERIAL AND AN ORAL POUCHED NICOTINE PRODUCT[2021/09]
French:MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE ET PRODUIT À BASE DE NICOTINE EN SACHET DESTINÉ À ÊTRE ADMINISTRÉ PAR VOIE ORALE[2021/09]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2020National basic fee paid 
24.11.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2020Examination requested  [2021/09]
24.11.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.03.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2021Fee for grant paid
21.04.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.04.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
Nonwovenn Ltd
BFF Business Park
Bath Road
Bridgwater, Somerset TA6 4NZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
 02  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
British-American Tobacco (Investments) Limited
Globe House, 1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
 03  02.03.2022  27.02.2022  WITHDRAWN
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Opponent's representative
HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 04  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
TENOWO GmbH
Am Windrad 5
08468 Heinsdorfergrund/Reichenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2023/17]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
Nonwovenn Ltd
BFF Business Park
Bath Road
Bridgwater, Somerset TA6 4NZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
 02  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
British-American Tobacco (Investments) Limited
Globe House, 1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  02.03.2022  27.02.2022  WITHDRAWN
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Opponent's representative
HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 04  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
TENOWO GmbH
Am Windrad 5
08468 Heinsdorfergrund/Reichenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2023/14]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
Nonwovenn Ltd
BFF Business Park
Bath Road
Bridgwater, Somerset TA6 4NZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
 02  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
British-American Tobacco (Investments) Limited
Globe House, 1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  02.03.2022  27.02.2022  WITHDRAWN
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Opponent's representative
HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 04  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
TENOWO GmbH
Am Windrad 5
08468 Heinsdorfergrund/Reichenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Werhahn, Jasper Carl
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
P.O. Box 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2022/15]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
Nonwovenn Ltd
BFF Business Park
Bath Road
Bridgwater, Somerset TA6 4NZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
 02  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
British-American Tobacco (Investments) Limited
Globe House, 1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 03  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Opponent's representative
HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
 04  02.03.2022  07.03.2022  ADMISSIBLE
TENOWO GmbH
Am Windrad 5
08468 Heinsdorfergrund/Reichenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Werhahn, Jasper Carl
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
P.O. Box 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
18.03.2022Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2022Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.11.2023Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2023Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.02.2024Appeal received No.  T0276/24
16.02.2024Payment of appeal fee
18.04.2024Statement of grounds filed
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2024/31]
Former [2022/26]AL02.06.2021
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1039024  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [A]WO2016040754  (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]);
 [A]WO2017093488  (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE]);
 [AD]EP3192380  (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE], et al)
by applicantUS4703765
 US6135120
 EP1803443
 WO2007126361
 WO2008133563
 WO2012069505
 WO2012134380
 WO2017093486
 EP3192380
OppositionDE102008038556
 EP2692254
 US2014242309
 WO2016040754
 WO2016083463
 US2018153211
 WO2020169514
 US2010018541
 US2014026912
 US2016000140
 WO2016090075
 WO2017093488
 EP3192380
 US2018257801
 EP0649796
 EP1039024
 WO2008152469
 US2016157515
 US2705687
 US3616180
 WO2007104573
 US2011193250
 US2014261473
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.