Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3938205 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202080020727 EP20712788 US2020019642W US202017437191



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11912010Global Dossier 27.02.2024B2
US2022161518 26.05.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962816579 11.03.2019
US202017437191 25.02.2020
WO2020US19642 25.02.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113811447Global Dossier 17.12.2021A
Priority number Date
US201962816579 11.03.2019
WO2020US19642 25.02.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3938205Global Dossier 19.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962816579 11.03.2019
WO2020US19642 25.02.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020185392Global Dossier 17.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962816579 11.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202039234 01.11.2020A
Priority number Date
US201962816579 11.03.2019