EP3930760 - CELL MEMBRANE PENETRATING CONJUGATES FOR GENE EDITING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cygenica Limited Unit 4 Joyce House Barrack Square Ballincollig Cork P31HW35 / IE | [2023/06] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Cyca Oncosolutions Limited The Rubicon Centre CIT Campus Bishopstown T12 Y275 Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANGHAMITRA, Nusrat c/o CyCa OncoSolutions Limited The Rubicon Centre CIT Campus, Bishopstown Cork, T12 Y275 / IE | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SANGHAMITRA, Nusrat Cork, T12 Y275 / IE | Representative(s) | Goodacre, Jonathan David, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20712835.6 | 27.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020EP55201 | Priority number, date | GB20190002648 | 27.02.2019 Original published format: GB 201902648 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020174070 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930760 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3930760 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/90, C12N15/87, C12N15/113, C12N15/10, C12N9/22, C12N9/88, C07K14/195, C07K14/435, A61K47/64, C12N9/10, C07K14/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
A61K47/6455 (EP,KR);
C07K14/32 (KR);
C12N15/90 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (KR);
A61K47/64 (EP,KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
C07K14/00 (EP);
C07K14/195 (EP,KR);
C07K14/315 (KR);
C07K14/43563 (EP);
C12N15/102 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/87 (EP);
C12N9/1029 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y203/01129 (EP,US);
C12Y203/01192 (KR);
C12Y402/01001 (KR);
C12Y402/02 (EP,US);
C12Y402/02002 (KR);
C07K2319/00 (KR);
C07K2319/04 (EP,US);
C07K2319/07 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | A61K47/64, C07K19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLMEMBRANDURCHDRINGENDE KONJUGATE ZUR GENEDITIERUNG | [2022/01] | English: | CELL MEMBRANE PENETRATING CONJUGATES FOR GENE EDITING | [2022/01] | French: | CONJUGUÉS PÉNÉTRANT LA MEMBRANE CELLULAIRE POUR ÉDITION DE GÈNE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 10.01.2024 | |
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 10.04.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6008016 (WALKER VIRGINIA K [CA], et al); | [A]JP2005239885 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]US2006269988 (ROYER MONIQUE [FR], et al); | by applicant | US2004176282 | US2013137644 | WO2017205846 |