EP3946588 - IMPLANTABLE ULTRASOUND GENERATING DEVICE FOR IMPLANTATION WITHIN A VERTEBRAL COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21 rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris 3 avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPENTIER, Alexandre 44 rue Cortambert 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CARPENTIER, Alexandre 75116 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20713319.0 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP58833 | Priority number, date | EP20190305406 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19305406 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193782 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946588 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61N7/00 (EP);
A61B8/481 (US);
A61M37/0092 (US);
A61M2210/1003 (US);
A61N2007/0021 (EP);
A61N2007/0039 (EP);
A61N2007/0047 (EP);
A61N2007/0056 (EP);
A61N2007/006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE ULTRASCHALLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLANTIERUNG IN EINE WIRBELSÄULE | [2022/06] | English: | IMPLANTABLE ULTRASOUND GENERATING DEVICE FOR IMPLANTATION WITHIN A VERTEBRAL COLUMN | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ULTRASONS IMPLANTABLE POUR L'IMPLANTATION DANS UNE COLONNE VERTÉBRALE | [2024/28] |
Former [2022/06] | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ULTRASONS IMPLANTABLE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE IMPLANTÉ DANS UNE COLONNE VERTÉBRALE | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014288544 (DIEDERICH CHRIS J [US], et al); | [A]US2019030374 (CARPENTIER ALEXANDRE [FR], et al); | [XI]US2019038923 (CARPENTIER ALEXANDRE [FR]) |