EP3948932 - MASS SPECTROMETER COMPRISING AN IONIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leybold GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORKHOVER, Leonid Mecklenburgweg 45 89075 Ulm / DE | 02 /
FEDOSENKO, Gennady Klemens-Eisenbarth-Straße 15 73433 Aalen / DE | 03 /
LAUE, Alexander Heinrich-Heine-Str. 17 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 04 /
REUTER, Rüdiger Am Wieselbach 9 45257 Essen / DE | 05 /
CHUNG, Hin Yiu Anthony Bei der Pilzbuche 62 89075 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
GORKHOVER, Leonid 89075 Ulm / DE | ||
02 /
FEDOSENKO, Gennady 73433 Aalen / DE | |||
03 /
LAUE, Alexander 89522 Heidenheim / DE | |||
04 /
REUTER, Rüdiger 45257 Essen / DE | |||
05 /
CHUNG, Hin Yiu Anthony 89075 Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Norton, Ian Andrew Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Norton, Ian Andrew Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20713570.8 | 20.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP57739 | Priority number, date | DE201910204694 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019204694 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020200833 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948932 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/10, H01J49/42 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01J49/424 (EP,KR,US);
H01J49/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01J49/0495 (US);
H01J49/022 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | MASSENSPEKTROMETER MIT IONISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | MASS SPECTROMETER COMPRISING AN IONIZATION DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'IONISATION | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 25.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014105089 (908 DEVICES INC [US]) | by applicant | WO2014118122 | WO2016096457 | WO2017194333 |