EP3948669 - METHOD FOR PATCHING AN OPERATING SYSTEM ON A SECURE ELEMENT TRANSPARENTLY THROUGH AN SM-SR PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAO, Frédéric c/o THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 02 /
GLINKA-HECQUET, Gerald c/o THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 03 /
DUBOIS, Denis c/o THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 04 /
DUPREZ, Jérôme c/o THALES DIS FRANCE SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
DAO, Frédéric 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
GLINKA-HECQUET, Gerald 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
DUBOIS, Denis 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | |||
04 /
DUPREZ, Jérôme 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Scheer, Luc Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier Zone Athelia IV 13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Scheer, Luc Thales Dis France SA Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier Zone Athelia IV 13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20713698.7 | 31.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP59179 | Priority number, date | EP20190305429 | 01.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19305429 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201313 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948669 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06F21/30, H04L29/06, H04W12/06 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
G06F21/30 (EP,KR);
H04W12/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/65 (US);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/0853 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPARENTEN PATCHEN EINES BETRIEBSSYSTEMS AUF EINEM SICHEREN ELEMENT ÜBER EINE SM-SR-PLATTFORM | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PATCHING AN OPERATING SYSTEM ON A SECURE ELEMENT TRANSPARENTLY THROUGH AN SM-SR PLATFORM | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION D'UN SYSTÈME D'EXPLOITATION SUR UN ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ DE FAÇON TRANSPARENTE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE PLATEFORME SM-SR | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 02.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 01.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014143534 (CHASTAIN WALTER COOPER [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0052] * * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2016021529 (PARK JONGHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-12 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0093] ** claims 1-20 *; | [X]US2017127264 (YANG XIANGYING [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0043] * * claims 1-20 *; | [X]CN108702386 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0287] * * claims 1-38 *; | [X]US2019065749 (YANG XIANGYING [US]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0070] * * claims 1-20 * |