EP3768651 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF FRESH CONCRETE AND FRESH CONCRETE OBTAINED BY THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERC-TECH A.S. Vysehradska 1349/2 Praha 2, Nove Mesto 128 00 / CZ | [2021/44] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states ERC-TECH A.S. Celakovskeho sady 1580/4 Praha 1, Move Mesto 110 00 / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLAK, Frantisek Havlickova 4 664 01 Ricmanice / CZ | 02 /
SLAVICKOVE, Lucie Sadky 381 664 43 Zelesice / CZ | 03 /
FIALA, Jiri 671 75 Vedrovice 370 671 75 Vedrovice 370 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | 01 /
POLAK, Frantisek Havlickova 4 664 01 Ricmanice / CZ | ||
02 /
SLAVICKOVE, Lucie Sadky 381 664 43 Zelesice / CZ | |||
03 /
FIALA, Jiri 671 75 Vedrovice 370 / CZ | Representative(s) | Musil, Dobroslav Dobroslav Musil a partneri s.r.o. Zabrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Musil, Dobroslav Zàbrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | Application number, filing date | 20713822.3 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/04] | WO2020CZ50006 | Priority number, date | CZ20190000375 | 14.06.2019 Original published format: CZ 20190375 | [2021/04] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249141 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768651 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP,CZ);
C04B18/16 (CZ);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/062, C04B14/106, C04B14/108, C04B14/185, C04B14/28, C04B18/08, C04B18/08, C04B18/12, C04B18/141, C04B18/167, C04B20/0048, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/062, C04B14/106, C04B14/108, C04B14/185, C04B14/28, C04B18/08, C04B18/12, C04B18/141, C04B18/141, C04B18/167, C04B20/0048, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/062, C04B14/106, C04B14/108, C04B14/28, C04B14/28, C04B18/08, C04B18/12, C04B18/141, C04B18/167, C04B18/24, C04B20/0048, C04B20/0076, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0028 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/062, C04B14/106, C04B14/108, C04B14/28, C04B16/08, C04B18/08, C04B18/12, C04B18/12, C04B18/141, C04B18/167, C04B20/0048, C04B20/0076, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0028 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FRISCHBETON UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER FRISCHBETON | [2021/04] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF FRESH CONCRETE AND FRESH CONCRETE OBTAINED BY THIS METHOD | [2021/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BÉTON FRAIS ET BÉTON FRAIS OBTENU PAR CE PROCÉDÉ | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2020 | Translation filed | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 21.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/04] | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2007013803 (ZOCO INNOVATIONS B V [NL], et al) [AD] 1,15 * claims 1-16 *; | [AD]CZ2007206 (CESKU VYSOKU UCENI TECHNICKU V [CZ]) [AD] 19 * abstract *; | [AD]CN105036660 (UNIV HOHAI) [AD] 1,15* the whole document *; | [A]EP2982450 (STONEX D O O [SI]) [A] 1,15 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]WO2017082747 (INST SUPERIOR TÉCNICO [PT], et al) [A] 1,15 * claims 1-10 *; | [IA]WO2018177447 (POLAK FRANTISEK [CZ], et al) [I] 15-19 * claims 1,2,14,15,29 * [A] 1-14; | [A]CZ307741 (ERC TECH A S [CZ]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-26 * |