EP3921495 - ACTUATION TRANSMISSION DEVICE FOR A LIFTING AND SLIDING ELEMENT WITH STOPPABLE ACTUATION LEVER AND LIFTING AND SLIDING ELEMENT EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/50] | ACTUATION GEAR MECHANISM FOR A LIFT AND SLIDE ELEMENT COMPRISING A LOCKABLE ACTUATION LEVER, AND A LIFT AND SLIDE ELEMENT EQUIPPED WITH SUCH AN ACTUATION GEAR MECHANISM | ||
[2023/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MACO Technologie GmbH Alpenstrasse 173 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTERLEHNER, Stefan Morzger Straße 74 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
MITTERLEHNER, Stefan 5020 Salzburg / AT | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20714122.7 | 09.03.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020EP56145 | Priority number, date | DE201910109642 | 11.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019109642 | [2021/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020207677 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921495 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3921495 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/00, E05B15/04, E05C9/02, E05C9/16, E05D15/56 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
E05B15/0013 (EP);
E05B15/006 (EP);
E05B15/04 (EP);
E05C9/02 (EP);
E05C9/16 (EP);
E05D15/565 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSGETRIEBE FÜR EIN HEBE-SCHIEBEELEMENT MIT ARRETIERBAREM BETÄTIGUNGSHEBEL SOWIE MIT SOLCH EINEM BETÄTIGUNGSGETRIEBE AUSGESTATTETES HEBE-SCHIEBEELEMENT | [2021/50] | English: | ACTUATION TRANSMISSION DEVICE FOR A LIFTING AND SLIDING ELEMENT WITH STOPPABLE ACTUATION LEVER AND LIFTING AND SLIDING ELEMENT EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2023/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR UN ÉLÉMENT LEVANT ET COULISSANT AVEC LEVIER D'ARRÊT ET ÉLÉMENT LEVANT ET COULISSANT AVEC UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2023/08] |
Former [2021/50] | ACTUATION GEAR MECHANISM FOR A LIFT AND SLIDE ELEMENT COMPRISING A LOCKABLE ACTUATION LEVER, AND A LIFT AND SLIDE ELEMENT EQUIPPED WITH SUCH AN ACTUATION GEAR MECHANISM | ||
Former [2021/50] | MÉCANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR UN ÉLÉMENT LEVANT ET COULISSANT POURVU D'UN LEVIER D'ACTIONNEMENT POUVANT ÊTRE BLOQUÉ AINSI QU'ÉLÉMENT LEVANT ET COULISSANT ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL MÉCANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE1002656 (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH) [X] 1,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 3-10 [Y] 2; | [XYI]KR200466047Y (-) [X] 1,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 3-10 [I] 2; | [YA]US2017298652 (LIAU WAN LAI [TW]) [Y] 2-10 * the whole document *[A] 1,11,12 |