EP3930689 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN TREATING PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TLC Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 611 Gateway Blvd., Suite 830 South San Francisco CA 94080 / US | For all designated states Taiwan Liposome Company, Ltd. 11F-1 No 3 Yuanqu Street Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAI, Tien-Tzu 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 02 /
TSENG, Yun-Long 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 03 /
SHIH, Sheue-Fang 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 04 /
KUO, Min-Wen 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 05 /
BROWN, Carl, Oscar 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 06 /
WANG, Hui-Ting 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 07 /
JAO, Weenee, Yeun Ng 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 08 /
HU, Pei-Hsien 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 09 /
YU, Wan-Ni 11F-1, No. 3, Yuanqu Street, Nangang District Taipei City 11503 / TW | 10 /
HONG, Keelung 611 Gateway Blvd., Suite 830 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 11 /
KAO, Hao-Wen 611 Gateway Blvd., Suite 830 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 12 /
LIN, Yi-Yu 611 Gateway Blvd., Suite 830 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
TAI, Tien-Tzu Taipei City 11503 / TW | ||
02 /
TSENG, Yun-Long Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
03 /
SHIH, Sheue-Fang Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
04 /
KUO, Min-Wen Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
05 /
BROWN, Carl, Oscar Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
06 /
WANG, Hui-Ting Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
07 /
JAO, Weenee, Yeun Ng Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
08 /
HU, Pei-Hsien Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
09 /
YU, Wan-Ni Taipei City 11503 / TW | |||
10 /
HONG, Keelung San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
11 /
KAO, Hao-Wen San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
12 /
LIN, Yi-Yu San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20714390.0 | 26.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US19806 | Priority number, date | US201962810378P | 26.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962810378 P | US201962848286P | 15.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962848286 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020176568 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930689 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/19, A61K31/445, A61P23/02, A61K9/127 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/19 (EP,KR);
A61K31/167 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,KR);
A61K47/24 (KR,US);
A61K47/28 (KR);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG | [2022/01] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN TREATING PAIN | [2022/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 26.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9949849 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [Y] 14 * page 3, line 12 - page 6, line 20 * * table 1 *; | [XYI]US2015250724 (YAMASHITA KEIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11-13,15-20,23,30-34 * page 2, paragraphs 0020-0033 * * page 3, paragraph 0039 - page 4, paragraph 0057 * * page 15, paragraphs 0202-0209 * * example - * [Y] 5,14,24-26,35 [I] 4,10,21,22; | [Y]CN108379269 (WUHAN BAINALIKANG BIOLOGICAL PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 5,24-26,35 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] * * example - *; | [XI] - Anonymous, "EXPAREL (bupivacaine liposome injectable suspension)", (201804), pages 1 - 28, URL: https://www.accessdata.fda.gov/drugsatfda_docs/label/2018/022496s9lbl.pdf, (20200515), XP055696012 [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13,17-20,23,27-34,36 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * [I] 10,16,21,22 | [T] - "A Basic Guide to Particle Characterization", Malvern Instruments Worldwide - White Paper, (20120502), pages 1 - 26, URL: http://golik.co.il/Data/ABasicGuidtoParticleCharacterization(2)_1962085150.pdf, XP055089322 [T] 18,20 | by applicant | - Regional Anesthesia and Pain Medicine, (19980000), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 189 - 196 |