EP3945763 - PLOUGH MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huber Soil Solution GmbH Franz-Nabl-Gasse 15 8435 Wagna / AT | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Franz-Ferdinand Franz-Nabl-Gasse 15 8435 Wagna / AT | [2023/17] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
HUBER, Franz-Ferdinand 8435 Wagna / AT | Representative(s) | Leske, Thomas Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20714529.3 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP58132 | Priority number, date | DE201910204256 | 27.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019204256 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193537 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945763 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3945763 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01B9/00, // A01B13/08, A01B49/02, A01B15/16, A01B15/10 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A01B9/003 (EP,US);
A01B13/08 (EP,US);
A01B15/16 (EP,US);
A01B49/025 (EP,US);
A01B15/10 (EP);
A01B9/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | A01B9/00, A01B13/08, A01B15/10, A01B15/16, A01B49/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLUGMODUL | [2022/06] | English: | PLOUGH MODULE | [2022/06] | French: | MODULE DE LABOUR | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 08.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NL | 26.04.2023 | |
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NL | 26.04.2023 | |
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB1385951 (CIONI P) [X] 1,6,8 * page 2, lines 83-130; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 2-5,7,9-12; | [A]SE505778 (ROBUR MASKIN AB [SE]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [YD]DE102017102683 (HUBER FRANZ FERDINAND [AT]) [YD] 2-5,7,9-12 * paragraphs [0071] - [0082] - [0087]; figures 1, 3, 4; claims 1-13 * | by applicant | DE102017102683 |