|
01.03.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2022 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
30 |
|
19.02.2021 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.02.2021 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
03.02.2021 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
23 |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
23 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
22.06.2020 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.04.2020 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.04.2020 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.04.2020 |
Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
07.04.2020 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
23 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |