Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
20.10.2023 | First examination report | |
19.10.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
24.06.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.01.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
21.01.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
27.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
10.04.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |