EP3941256 - SMOKING SUBSTITUTE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol, BS3 2LL / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMAS, Pete c/o Nerudia Limited Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | 02 /
AGGARWAL, Nikhil c/o Nerudia Limited Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
LOMAS, Pete Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | ||
02 /
AGGARWAL, Nikhil Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20715698.5 | 13.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP56777 | Priority number, date | EP20190020183 | 22.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19020183 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193178 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941256 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | RAUCHERSATZSYSTEM | [2022/04] | English: | SMOKING SUBSTITUTE SYSTEM | [2022/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUBSTITUTION POUR FUMEURS | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2014360515 (VASILIEV VLADIMIR [RU], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0087]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2017042243 (PLOJOUX JULIEN [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0029] , [0047]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2018220558 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * page 13, line 27 - line 33; figure -; claim - * |