EP3947540 - METHOD FOR STABILIZING THERMOPLASTIC RECYCLATES, STABILIZED PLASTIC COMPOSITIONS, AND MOLDING COMPOUNDS AND MOLDED PARTS PRODUCED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFAENDNER, Rudolf c/o Fraunhofer Institut für Betriebsfestigkeit und Systemzuverlässigkeit LBF Bartningstr. 47 64289 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
PFAENDNER, Rudolf 64289 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20715790.0 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP58188 | Priority number, date | DE201910204160 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019204160 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193563 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947540 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3947540 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/04, C08K5/20, C08K5/17, C08K5/103, C08K5/06, C08K5/053, C08K5/00, C08K5/11, C08K5/12 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C08J11/04 (EP);
C08K5/005 (EP,KR);
C08K5/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/203 (US);
C08K5/06 (US);
C08K5/103 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/11 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/13 (US);
C08K5/151 (US);
C08K5/1545 (KR);
C08K5/17 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2300/22 (EP);
C08K2201/014 (US);
Y02P20/143 (EP,KR);
Y02W30/62 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | C08J11/04, C08K5/00, C08K5/053, C08K5/06, C08K5/103, C08K5/17, C08K5/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON THERMOPLASTISCHEN KUNSTSTOFF-REZYKLATEN SOWIE STABILISIERTE KUNSTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND HIERAUS HERGESTELLTE FORMMASSEN UND FORMTEILE | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD FOR STABILIZING THERMOPLASTIC RECYCLATES, STABILIZED PLASTIC COMPOSITIONS, AND MOLDING COMPOUNDS AND MOLDED PARTS PRODUCED THEREFROM | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR STABILISER DES PRODUITS RECYCLÉS À BASE DE MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES THERMOPLASTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS DE MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES STABILISÉES AINSI QUE MASSES À MOULER ET PIÈCES MOULÉES FABRIQUÉES À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 05.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09176416 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-30* abstract *; | [A]EP0881253 (AKCROS CHEM [GB]) [A] 1-30 * claims 1,8 * * page 2, line 27 - line 40 *; | [A]JP2005179517 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [XAI]EP2641933 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 19-27 * claims 1,5,8-10,19 * * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0038] , [ 0040] , [ 0045] * [A] 1-18,28-30 [I] 19-27 | by applicant | DE2423278 | DD288161 | EP0470048 | EP0506614 | EP0662101 | EP0702704 | WO9730112 | US5789470 | US6251972 | US6525158 | EP1426406 | WO2014141178 | - R. PFAENDNER et al., Angew. Makromol. Chemie, (19950000), vol. 232, pages 193 - 227 | - J. POSPISIL et al., Pol. Degr. Stab., (19950000), vol. 48, pages 351 - 358 | - A. S. MAXWELL, Pol. Eng. Sci., (20080000), pages 381 - 385 | - I. H. CRAIGJ. R. WHITE, J. Mater. Sci ., (20060000), vol. 41, pages 993 - 1006 | - L. LUZURIAGAJ. KOVAROVAI. FORTELNY, Pol. Degr. Stab., (20060000), vol. 91, pages 1226 - 1232 | - R. PFAENDNER, Kunststoffe International, (20151200), pages 41 - 44 | - E. REINEFELDG. KLAUNBERG, Tenside, (19680000), vol. 5, no. 9-10, pages 266 - 270 | - A.F. ARTAMANOV et al., Chemistry of Natural Compounds, (20010000), vol. 37, pages 124 - 125 | - Y. WATANABE et al., Tetrahedron, (20130000), vol. 69, pages 4657 - 4664 | - W. WEI et al., Green Chemistry, (20150000), vol. 17, pages 3475 - 3489 | - E. RICHAUD et al., Pol. Degr. Stab., (20090000), vol. 94, pages 410 - 420 |