EP3953462 - POLYPEPTIDE VARIANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OESTERGAARD, Lars, Henrik Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
JOHANSEN, Annette, Helle Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 03 /
DANIELSEN, Steffen Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 04 /
PACHE, Roland, Alexander Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 05 /
JENSEN, Johanne, Moerch Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 06 /
RASMUSSEN, Frank, Winther Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 07 /
GUDMAND, Martin Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 08 /
TIDEMAND, Kasper, Damgaard Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20715892.4 | 06.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020EP59712 | Priority number, date | EP20190168512 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19168512 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020207944 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953462 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24, C11D3/386 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C12N9/2402 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (US);
C11D3/38636 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12Y302/01052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDVARIANTEN | [2022/07] | English: | POLYPEPTIDE VARIANTS | [2022/07] | French: | VARIANTS POLYPEPTIDIQUES | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2017186943 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [XD] 1-9,17,18 * claim 1; sequences 10, 11 * [I] 23; | [XI]WO2018184873 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [X] 1-9,17,18 * claims 9-13; sequences 98, 99 * [I] 23; | [A] - SHARMA R ET AL, "A single site in human beta-hexosaminidase A binds both 6-sulfate-groups on hexosamines and the sialic acid moiety of GM2 ganglioside", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR BASIS OF DISE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030120), vol. 1637, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0925-4439(02)00221-1, ISSN 0925-4439, pages 113 - 118, XP004402236 [A] 1-9,17,18,23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4439(02)00221-1 | [A] - SUBA G. A. MANUEL ET AL, "Role of active-site residues of dispersin B, a biofilm-releasing [beta]-hexosaminidase from a periodontal pathogen, in substrate hydrolysis : Active site of dispersin B", FEBS JOURNAL, GB, (20071019), vol. 274, no. 22, doi:10.1111/j.1742-4658.2007.06121.x, ISSN 1742-464X, pages 5987 - 5999, XP055589742 [A] 1-9,17,18,23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2007.06121.x | by applicant | GB1296839 | GB1483591 | US4106991 | US4435307 | EP0179486 | EP0218272 | US4661452 | EP0238023 | EP0238216 | EP0258068 | EP0305216 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | WO8909259 | JPH02238885 | EP0407225 | WO9201046 | WO9205249 | WO9206204 | EP0495257 | WO9217517 | WO9219729 | WO9221760 | EP0531372 | EP0531315 | US5223409 | WO9318140 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9402597 | WO9407998 | WO9418314 | US5352604 | WO9425612 | WO9425583 | WO9425578 | EP0624154 | US5389536 | WO9506720 | WO9510603 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9517413 | WO9522625 | WO9522615 | WO9523221 | WO9524471 | US5457046 | WO9527046 | WO9530744 | WO9533836 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9600787 | WO9611262 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9623873 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9634946 | WO9704079 | WO9704102 | WO9707202 | WO9708325 | US5648263 | US5686593 | WO9743424 | US5691178 | WO9808940 | WO9812307 | WO9815257 | WO9817767 | WO9820115 | WO9820116 | US5763254 | US5776757 | WO9901544 | WO9911768 | WO9919467 | WO9943835 | US5977053 | US6011147 | WO0024883 | WO0034450 | WO0056900 | WO0060063 | WO0116285 | WO0144452 | WO0162903 | WO0166712 | WO0179459 | WO0179458 | WO0179461 | WO0179460 | WO0192502 | WO0210355 | WO0216547 | WO0226024 | US6472364 | WO02099091 | WO03006602 | WO03040279 | WO2004003186 | EP1382668 | WO2004041979 | WO2004067737 | US2004171154 | WO2004074419 | WO2005003274 | WO2005003275 | WO2005003276 | WO2005040372 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | WO2005056782 | WO2006066594 | EP1705241 | WO2006108856 | WO2006113314 | WO2006130575 | WO2007001262 | WO2007006305 | WO2007044993 | WO2007087258 | WO2007087244 | WO2007087259 | WO2007087242 | WO2007087257 | WO2007087243 | WO2007087508 | US7262042 | WO2007138054 | EP1867708 | EP1867808 | EP1876226 | EP1921147 | EP1921148 | WO2008153815 | WO2009000605 | US2009011970 | WO2009004295 | WO2009004294 | WO2009010375 | WO2009015951 | WO2009021867 | WO2009021784 | WO2009021813 | WO2009024780 | WO2009030632 | WO2009040544 | WO2009040545 | WO2009047125 | WO2009047126 | WO2009047127 | WO2009047128 | WO2009050026 | WO2009061380 | WO2009063355 | WO2009067279 | WO2009065770 | WO2009068501 | WO2009072069 | WO2009074398 | WO2009074403 | WO2009087523 | WO2009087033 | WO2009092699 | WO2009095645 | WO2009102854 | WO2009103822 | WO2009109500 | WO2009112296 | WO2009112298 | WO2009117340 | WO2009117341 | WO2009117342 | WO2009115391 | WO2009115392 | WO2009124162 | WO2009124163 | WO2009121757 | WO2009122125 | WO2009121725 | WO2009132870 | WO2010000636 | WO2010003783 | WO2010003792 | WO2010014395 | WO2010018043 | WO2010024467 | WO2010024469 | WO2010024470 | WO2010025161 | WO2010030540 | WO2010030541 | WO2010030539 | WO2010033976 | WO2010033746 | WO2010033747 | WO2010033897 | WO2010033979 | WO2010031607 | EP2169040 | WO2010039889 | WO2010044905 | WO2010049187 | WO2010054986 | WO2010057784 | WO2010060821 | WO2010065455 | WO2010063689 | WO2010066486 | WO2010066631 | WO2010066632 | WO2010069742 | WO2010069718 | WO2010069957 | WO2010069905 | WO2010072456 | WO2010072603 | WO2010076292 | WO2010076165 | WO2010078979 | WO2010084039 | WO2010084203 | WO2010090915 | WO2010094356 | WO2010100028 | WO2010099997 | WO2010102861 | WO2010107560 | WO2010108002 | WO2010108000 | WO2010107635 | WO2010105942 | WO2010105961 | WO2010105962 | WO2010111143 | WO2010111365 | WO2010115813 | WO2010120863 | WO2010118959 | WO2010122051 | WO2010135238 | WO2010142503 | WO2010142539 | WO2010145887 | WO2011005803 | WO2011005623 | WO2011005730 | WO2011005844 | WO2011005904 | WO2011005630 | WO2011005830 | WO2011005912 | WO2011005905 | WO2011005910 | WO2011005813 | WO2011016958 | WO2011025615 | WO2011023716 | WO2011036263 | WO2011036264 | WO2011084412 | WO2011084417 | WO2011084599 | WO2011098531 | WO2011150157 | WO2012137147 | WO2013001078 | WO2013001087 | WO2013188331 | WO2016001449 | WO2016180748 | WO2017186943 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - RICE, "EMBOSS: The European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", Trends Genet., (20000000), vol. 16, doi:10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2, pages 276 - 277, XP004200114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2 | - EDGAR, Nucleic Acids Research, (20040000), vol. 32, pages 1792 - 1797 | - KATOHKUMA, Nucleic Acids Research, (20020000), vol. 30, pages 3059 - 3066 | - KATOH et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20050000), vol. 33, pages 511 - 518 | - KATOHTOH, Bioinformatics, (20070000), vol. 23, pages 372 - 374 | - KATOH, Methods in Molecular Biology, (20090000), vol. 537, pages 39 - 64 | - KATOHTOH, Bioinformatics, (20100000), vol. 26, pages 1899 - 1900 | - THOMPSON et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19940000), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - LINDAHLELOFSSON, J. Mol. Biol., (20000000), vol. 313, pages 903 - 919 | - ATSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - JONES, J. Mol. Biol., (19990000), vol. 287, pages 797 - 815 | - MCGUFFINJONES, Bioinformatics, (20030000), vol. 19, pages 874 - 881 | - HOLMSANDER, Proteins, (19980000), vol. 33, pages 88 - 96 | - SHINDYALOVBOURNE, Protein Engineering, (19980000), vol. 11, pages 739 - 747 | - HOLMPARK, Bioinformatics, (20000000), vol. 16, pages 566 - 567 | - SCHERERDAVIS, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19790000), vol. 76, pages 4949 - 4955 | - CUNNINGHAMWELLS, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - HILTON, J. Biol. Chem., (19960000), vol. 271, pages 4699 - 4708 | - DE VOS et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - SMITH et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - WLODAVER, FEBS Lett., (19920000), vol. 309, pages 59 - 64 | - BARTON et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, pages 7349 - 4966 | - STORICI, Nature Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 19, pages 773 - 776 | - KREN et al., Nat. Med., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 285 - 290 | - CALISSANOMACINO, Fungal Genet. Newslett., (19960000), vol. 43, pages 15 - 16 | - TIAN et al., Nature, (20040000), vol. 432, pages 1050 - 1054 | - REIDHAAR-OLSONSAUER, Science, (19880000), vol. 241, pages 53 - 57 | - BOWIESAUER, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 2152 - 2156 | - LOWMAN et al., Biochemistry, (19910000), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10837 | - DERBYSHIRE et al., Gene, (19860000), vol. 46, page 145 | - NER et al., DNA, (19880000), vol. 7, page 127 | - NESS et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19990000), vol. 17, pages 893 - 896 | - RODRIGO M.P. SILO TORANDALL J. WESELAKE, "Methods and applications in protein engineering", Biocatalysis and Agricultural Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 1, doi:10.1016/j.bcab.2012.03.010, pages 181 - 189, XP055412897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcab.2012.03.010 | - "MiSeq: A Next Generation Sequencing Platform for Genomic Analysis", RAVI R.K.WALTON K.KHOSROHEIDARI M., Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (20180000), vol. 1706 | - AGAISSELERECLUS, Molecular Microbiology, (19940000), vol. 13, pages 97 - 107 | - EGON et al., Gene, (19880000), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315 | - VILLA-KAMAROFF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19780000), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19830000), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - GILBERT et al., "Useful proteins from recombinant bacteria", Scientific American, (19800000), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - ROMANOS et al., Yeast, (19920000), vol. 8, pages 423 - 488 | - HUE et al., J. Bacteriol., (19950000), vol. 177, pages 3465 - 3471 | - GUOSHERMAN, Mol. Cellular Biol., (19950000), vol. 15, pages 5983 - 5990 | - SIMONENPALVA, Microbiological Reviews, (19930000), vol. 57, pages 109 - 137 | - GEMS et al., Gene, (19910000), vol. 98, pages 61 - 67 | - CULLEN et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19870000), vol. 15, pages 9163 - 9175 | - CHANGCOHEN, Mol. Gen. Genet., (19790000), vol. 168, pages 111 - 115 | - YOUNGSPIZIZEN, J. Bacteriol., (19610000), vol. 81, pages 823 - 829 | - DUBNAUDAVIDOFF-ABELSON, J. Mol. Biol., (19710000), vol. 56, pages 209 - 221 | - SHIGEKAWADOWER, Biotechniques, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 742 - 751 | - KOEHLERTHOME, J. Bacteriol., (19870000), vol. 169, pages 5271 - 5278 | - HANAHAN, J. Mol. Biol., (19830000), vol. 166, pages 557 - 580 | - DOWER et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19880000), vol. 16, pages 6127 - 6145 | - GONG et al., Folia Microbiol., (20040000), vol. 49, pages 399 - 405 | - MAZODIER et al., J. Bacteriol., (19890000), vol. 171, pages 3583 - 3585 | - BURKE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20010000), vol. 98, pages 6289 - 6294 | - CHOI et al., J. Microbiol. Methods, (20060000), vol. 64, pages 391 - 397 | - PINEDOSMETS, Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20050000), vol. 71, pages 51 - 57 | - PERRYKURAMITSU, Infect. Immun., (19810000), vol. 32, pages 1295 - 1297 | - CATTJOLLICK, Microbios, (19910000), vol. 68, pages 189 - 207 | - BUCKLEY et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19990000), vol. 65, pages 3800 - 3804 | - CLEWELL, Microbiol. Rev., (19810000), vol. 45, pages 409 - 436 | - YELTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19840000), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - CHRISTENSEN, BiolTechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 1419 - 1422 | - MALARDIER, Gene, (19890000), vol. 78, pages 147 - 156 | - "Guide to Yeast Genetics and Molecular Biology", BECKERGUARENTE, Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc., vol. 194, pages 182 - 187 | - ITO et al., J. Bacteriol., (19830000), vol. 153, page 163 | - HINNEN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19780000), vol. 75, page 1920 | - SIEZEN et al., Protein Engng., (19910000), vol. 4, pages 719 - 737 | - SIEZEN et al., Protein Science, (19970000), vol. 6, pages 501 - 523 | - OSTERGAARD PRWILTING RLASSEN SF, "Identification and characterization of a bacterial glutamic peptidase", BMC Biochem., (20100000), vol. 11, doi:10.1186/1471-2091-11-47, page 47, XP021085815 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2091-11-47 |