EP3908394 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATMENT OF VOC GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOCCI OY Radiokatu 7 A 8 00240 Helsinki / FI | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYLYKANGAS, Reijo c/o Vocci Oy Radiokatu 7 A 8 00240 Helsinki / FI | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
LYLYKANGAS, Reijo 00240 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY c/o Spaces Mannerheiminaukio 1A 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20715939.3 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020FI50020 | Priority number, date | FI20190005017 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: FI 20195017 | [2021/46] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020144409 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3908394 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3908394 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, B01D53/88, B01J8/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B01D53/8668 (EP);
B01D53/86 (FI);
B01D53/8687 (FI);
B01D53/88 (EP);
F23C13/00 (FI);
F23G7/06 (FI);
B01D2257/708 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GASEN MIT FLÜCHTIGEN ORGANISCHEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | [2022/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATMENT OF VOC GASES | [2021/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ CONTENANT DES COV | [2022/38] |
Former [2021/46] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VOC-GASEN | ||
Former [2021/46] | APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ DE COV | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 05.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5941697 (CHAOUKI JAMAI [CA], et al) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [A]US2012308453 (LYLYKANGAS REIJO [FI], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US8609052 (SAPOUNDJIEV HRISTO [CA]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015018978 (FORMIA SMART FLOW HONG KONG LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 12, lines 20-33; figure 2 * |