EP3938108 - FLUID CONTROL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/03] | FLUID CONTROL DEVICES AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | ||
[2023/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. 200 West Mercer Street, Suite 500 Seattle WA 98119 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULLINGTON, Gregory J. 2121 6th Avenue S1713 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | 02 /
MIAZGA, Jay M. P.O. Box 1208 Langley, Washington 98260 / US | 03 /
RAMSEY, Timothy F. 518 N 70th St. Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | 04 /
PATTERSON, Abigail 6450 24th Ave. 518 Seattle, Washington 98107 / US | [2023/31] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
BULLINGTON, Gregory J. Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | ||
02 /
MIAZGA, Jay M. Langley, Washington 98260 / US | |||
03 /
RAMSEY, Timothy F. Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | |||
04 /
PATTERSON, Abigail Seattle, Washington 98107 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20716348.6 | 11.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22125 | Priority number, date | US201962816477P | 11.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962816477 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185914 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938108 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3938108 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, A61B5/15, A61B5/153, // A61B5/154, A61B10/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B01L3/563 (EP,CN,IL);
A61B5/150343 (CN,IL,US);
A61B10/0045 (EP,CN,IL);
A61B5/15003 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B5/150099 (CN,IL,US);
A61B5/150145 (CN,IL,US);
A61B5/150221 (EP,IL);
A61B5/150251 (EP,CN,IL);
A61B5/150755 (CN,IL,US);
A61B5/150992 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B5/153 (EP,CN,IL);
A61B5/154 (EP,IL);
B01L3/502 (CN,IL,US);
C12M33/04 (CN);
C12M33/07 (CN);
B01L2200/026 (CN,IL,US);
B01L2200/141 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B01L2300/0672 (CN,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | B01L3/00, A61B5/15, A61B10/00, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/08] | English: | FLUID CONTROL DEVICES | [2023/08] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE RÉGULATION DE FLUIDE | [2023/08] |
Former [2022/03] | FLUIDSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2022/03] | FLUID CONTROL DEVICES AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2022/03] | DISPOSITIFS DE RÉGULATION DE FLUIDE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23182529.0 / EP4265186 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014022275 (MAGNOLIA MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [1002] , [ 1029] - [1042]; figure 1; claims 1, 2, 4, 5, 10 *; | [XD]US2015342510 (BULLINGTON GREGORY J [US], et al) [XD] 1,12,20 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 158] - [0168]; figures 41-45; claims 30, 45 *; | [A]WO2016054252 (EXOSOME DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,12,20* figures 2, 8; claims 1, 2, 5, 6, 21 *; | [XAI]US2018353117 (BULLINGTON GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,12,17,18,20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 54] - [0071] - [ 237] - [0247] - [ 265] - [0273]; figures 1, 28, 30, 31; claims 1, 2, 10, 11, 13, 18, 19, 20, 24, 25, 30, 31 * [A] 3-6,10,11,13-15,21-29 [I] 8,9,16,19 | by applicant | US8197420 | US8535241 | US9060724 | US9155495 | US2015342510 | US2016361006 | US9950084 | US2018140240 | US10123783 | US2019076074 |