EP3939322 - IN-LOOP RESHAPING ADAPTIVE RESHAPER DIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRIVON, Pierre c/o InterDigital R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 02 /
CHEVANCE, Christophe c/o InterDigital R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 03 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard c/o InterDigital R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
ANDRIVON, Pierre 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | ||
02 /
CHEVANCE, Christophe 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | |||
03 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Rittner, Karsten Rittner & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Schiffgraben 17 30159 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 20716355.1 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22222 | Priority number, date | EP20190305296 | 13.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19305296 | EP20190305785 | 19.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19305785 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185984 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939322 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/82, H04N19/70 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR);
H04N19/82 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/117 (KR,US);
G06F1/03 (US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE UMFORMERRICHTUNG ZUR IN-LOOP-UMFORMUNG | [2022/03] | English: | IN-LOOP RESHAPING ADAPTIVE RESHAPER DIRECTION | [2022/03] | French: | REMISE EN FORME EN BOUCLE DE DIRECTION D'UNITÉ DE REMISE EN FORME ADAPTATIVE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2018124399 (SU GUAN-MING [US]); |