EP3947023 - CONNECTION DEVICE FOR CHARGING AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Klingenbergstrasse 26 32758 Detmold / DE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖNSCH, Matthias An der Windflöte 5a 33659 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
WÜNSCHE, Torsten Schötmarsche Str. 83a 33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE | 03 /
HOLTERHOFF, Klaus Holunderweg 3 57462 Olpe / DE | 04 /
KRIETE, Thomas Am Bürener Berg 8 49504 Lotte / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
BÖNSCH, Matthias 33659 Bielefeld / DE | ||
02 /
WÜNSCHE, Torsten 33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE | |||
03 /
HOLTERHOFF, Klaus 57462 Olpe / DE | |||
04 /
KRIETE, Thomas 49504 Lotte / DE | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20716450.0 | 31.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP59160 | Priority number, date | DE201910108364 | 31.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019108364 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201300 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947023 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/14, B60L53/30 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP);
B60L53/16 (US);
B60L53/18 (US);
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
H01R13/502 (US);
H01R13/665 (US);
H01R2201/26 (US);
H02G9/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN EINES ELEKTROFAHRZEUGS | [2022/06] | English: | CONNECTION DEVICE FOR CHARGING AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CHARGER UN VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 08.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AT12232U (SAUPER UMWELTDATENTECHNIK GES M B H [AT]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0061] * * figure 7 *; | [Y]DE102017118916 (INNOGY SE [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] ** figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE102017124469 (ENGELN & MASNITZA & WAGNER GBR VERTRETUNGSBERECHTIGTE GES MICHAEL MASNITZA 90473 NUERNBERG TOBIAS WA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0087] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3 [I] 9 |