EP3946187 - A CONFORMABLE DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIBEL, Krystal J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HUNTER, Kristopher E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HEINECKE, Steven B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SCHEIBEL, Krystal J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
HUNTER, Kristopher E. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
HEINECKE, Steven B. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20716939.2 | 19.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020IB52552 | Priority number, date | US201962827400P | 01.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962827400 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201879 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946187 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61M25/02 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61F13/023 (EP);
A61F13/0233 (US);
A61F13/0236 (US);
A61M25/02 (EP);
A61M2025/0273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ANPASSBARER VERBAND | [2022/06] | English: | A CONFORMABLE DRESSING | [2022/06] | French: | PANSEMENT CONFORTABLE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 05.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP1121679 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [XA]US2010121282 (PROPP DONALD J [US]); | [A]WO2013150487 (EMODIAL S R L [IT]); | [A]US2016263351 (SCHÜTZ PATRICK [DE], et al); | [XPA]WO2019073326 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) | by applicant | USRE24906E | US3389827 | US3645835 | US4112213 | US4310509 | US4323557 | US4595001 | US4737410 | US5088483 | US5160315 | US5230701 | US6685682 | US6994904 | WO2010056541 | WO2010056543 | US2015014949 |