EP3949246 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING A WHITE-BOX CIPHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irdeto B.V. Taurus Avenue 105 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Tingting 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | 02 /
LOU, Dafu 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | 03 /
VON WILLICH, Manfred 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LIN, Tingting 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | ||
02 /
LOU, Dafu 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | |||
03 /
VON WILLICH, Manfred 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20717280.0 | 23.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020IB52693 | Priority number, date | US201916368922 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US201916368922 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201899 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3949246 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, H04L9/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H04L9/0631 (EP,US);
G06F16/9017 (US);
G06F16/9027 (US);
H04L63/1441 (US);
H04L9/003 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (US);
H04L2209/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES WHITE-BOX-CODIERSCHLÜSSELS | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING A WHITE-BOX CIPHER | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN CHIFFREMENT EN BOÎTE BLANCHE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 15.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - TINGTING LIN ET AL, "Security Evaluation and Improvement of a White-Box SMS4 Implementation Based on Affine Equivalence Algorithm", COMPUTER JOURNAL., GB, (20180718), vol. 61, no. 12, doi:10.1093/comjnl/bxy068, ISSN 0010-4620, pages 1783 - 1790, XP055694746 [A] 1-18 * sections 2, 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/comjnl/bxy068 | [A] - NIKOVA SVETLA ET AL, Threshold Implementations Against Side-Channel Attacks and Glitches, ROBOCUP 2008: ROBOCUP 2008: ROBOT SOCCER WORLD CUP XII; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 529 - 545, (20061204), ISBN 978-3-319-10403-4, XP047518188 [A] 1-18 * sections 3, 4, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11935308_38 | [A] - RUDRA A ET AL, "EFFICIENT RIJNDAEL ENCRYPTION IMPLEMENTATION WITH COMPOSITE FIELD ARITHMETIC", CRYPTOGRAPHIC HARDWARE AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS. 3RD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, CHES 2001, PARIS, FRANCCE, MAY 14 - 16, 2001 PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], BERLIN : SPRINGER, DE, (20010514), vol. 2162, doi:10.1007/3-540-44709-1_16, ISBN 978-3-540-42521-2, pages 171 - 184, XP001176598 [A] 1-18 * sections 2, 4, 5, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-44709-1_16 | by applicant | - "White-box cryptography and an AES implementation", CHOW, S.EISEN, P.JOHNSON, H.VAN OORSCHOT, P.C., International Workshop on Selected Areas in Cryptography, Springer, (20020800), pages 250 - 270 | - XIAO, Y.LAI, X., White-Box Cryptography and a White-Box Implementation of the SMS4 Algorithm, Shanghai Jiaotong University, (20090000), pages 24 - 34 | - SHI, Y.WEI, W.HE, Z., "Lightweight White-box Symmetric Encryption Algorithm Against Node Capture for WSNs", Sensors, (20150000), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 11928 - 11952 | - LIN, TINGTING et al., "Security Evaluation and Improvement of a White-Box SMS4 Implementation Based on Affine Equivalence Algorithm", The Computer Journal, (20180000), vol. 61.12, pages 1783 - 1790 | - "Efficient Rijndael Encryption Implementation with Composite Field Arithmetic", RUDRA, A.DUBEY, P.K.JUTLA, C.S.KUMAR, V.RAO, J.R.ROHATGI, P., International Work-shop on Cryptographic Hardware and Embedded Systems, Springer, (20010500), pages 171 - 184 | - "Composite field GF (((2 2) 2) 2) AES S-Box with Direct Computation in GF (2 4) Inversion, Information Technology in Asia (CITA 11", WONG, M.M.WONG, M.L.D.HIJZIN, I.NANDI, A.K., 7th International Conference on, IEEE., (20110000), pages 1 - 6 | - "Threshold implementations of all 3x 3 and 4x 4 S-Boxes", BILGIN BNIKOVA SNIKOV VRIJMEN VSTUTZ G, International Workshop on Cryptographic Hardware and Embedded Systems, Springer, (20120900), vol. 9, pages 441 - 455 | - "Threshold Implementations Against Side-channel Attacks and Glitches", NIKOVA, S.RECHBERGER, C.RIJMEN, V., International conference on information and communications security, Springer, (20061200), pages 529 - 545 | - "Secure Hardware Implementation of Non-linear Functions in the Presence of Glitches", NIKOVA, S.RIJMEN, V.SCHLÄFFER, M, International Conference on Information Security and Cryptology, Springer, (20081200), pages 218 - 234 | - "A Toolbox for Cryptanalysis: Linear and Affine Equivalence Algorithms", BIRYUKOV, A.DE CANNIERE, C.BRAEKEN, A. et al., Advances in Cryptology-EUROCRYPT 2003, Springer, (20030500), pages 33 - 50 | - SHI, Y.WEI, W.HE, Z., "lightweight white-box symmetric encryption algorithm against node capture for WSNs", Sen-sors, (20150000), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 11928 - 11952 |