EP3939326 - PROBABILITY INITIALIZATION FOR VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Jie 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SAID, Amir 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SEREGIN, Vadim 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
DONG, Jie San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
SAID, Amir San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
SEREGIN, Vadim San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20717464.0 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22355 | Priority number, date | US201962817475P | 12.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962817475 P | US201962834297P | 15.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962834297 P | US201962871519P | 08.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962871519 P | US202016816016 | 11.03.2020 Original published format: US202016816016 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020186038 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939326 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/91, H04N19/70 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,IL,KR);
H04N19/13 (IL,KR,US);
H04N19/124 (IL,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (IL,KR,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | WAHRSCHEINLICHKEITSINITIALISIERUNG FÜR VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2022/03] | English: | PROBABILITY INITIALIZATION FOR VIDEO CODING | [2022/03] | French: | INITIALISATION DE PROBABILITÉ POUR CODAGE VIDÉO | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 07.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |