EP3938178 - TECHNIQUES FOR OPTIMIZING PHOTOPOLYMER CURE ENERGY IN ADDITIVE FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Formlabs, Inc. 35 Medford Street Suite No.1 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDMAN, Andrew, M. 29 Cranberry Circle Stow, MA 01775 / US | 02 /
WHITNEY, Henry 104 Hanian Drive Weymouth, MA 02189 / US | 03 /
KEENAN, Justin 162 Maple Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 04 /
FRANTZDALE, Benjamin 128 Littleton Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 05 /
FOGLEMAN, Michael 404 Gravel Brook Court Cary, NC 27519 / US | 06 /
MEGRETSKI, Dmitri 575B West Street Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
GOLDMAN, Andrew, M. Stow, MA 01775 / US | ||
02 /
WHITNEY, Henry Weymouth, MA 02189 / US | |||
03 /
KEENAN, Justin Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
04 /
FRANTZDALE, Benjamin Harvard, MA 01451 / US | |||
05 /
FOGLEMAN, Michael Cary, NC 27519 / US | |||
06 /
MEGRETSKI, Dmitri Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20717466.5 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22361 | Priority number, date | US201962819084P | 15.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962819084 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020190638 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938178 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/386, B33Y10/00, B33Y40/10, B33Y50/00, B29C64/135, B29C64/268 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
B29C64/386 (EP,US);
B29C64/268 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y40/10 (EP);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | B29C64/286 | ||
Former IPC [2022/03] | B29C64/135, B29C64/268, B29C64/386, B33Y10/00, B33Y40/10, B33Y50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER PHOTOPOLYMER-HÄRTUNGSENERGIE FÜR ADDITIVE HERSTELLUNG | [2023/18] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR OPTIMIZING PHOTOPOLYMER CURE ENERGY IN ADDITIVE FABRICATION | [2022/03] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'OPTIMISATION DE L'ÉNERGIE DE DURCISSEMENT DES PHOTOPOLYMÈRES EN FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/03] | TECHNIKEN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER AUSHÄRTUNGSENERGIE VON PHOTOPOLYMEREN BEI DER GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | ||
Former [2022/03] | TECHNIQUES POUR OPTIMISER L'ÉNERGIE DE DURCISSEMENT D'UN PHOTOPOLYMÈRE EN FABRICATION ADDITIVE | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 20.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP1894704 (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-9,11-17 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 31] , [0 34] , [0 36] , [0 38]; figures 5, 12, 13; claim 16 * [A] 10,18; | [A]US2008169587 (KIHARA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 34]; figures 7-9 *; | [A]WO2017194113 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0032] , [0 35]; claim 6 * | by applicant | US2018085994 |