EP4128566 - METHOD FOR UTILIZING BEAM-SPECIFIC CELL-INDIVIDUAL OFFSETS IN A USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIERING, Ingo Kaspar-Spaet-Strasse 11 81549 Munich / DE | 02 /
LOBINGER, Andreas Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 16 85567 Grafing / DE | 03 /
AWADA, Ahmad Fritz-Bauer-Strasse 13 81249 Munich / DE | 04 /
MARTIKAINEN, Henrik Ukonmutka 2 A 6 40250 Jyväskylä / FI | 05 /
KARABULUT, Umur Sedlmayrstr. 14 80634 Munich / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20717591.0 | 31.03.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020EP59180 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021197591 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128566 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04W36/00, H04W36/08, H04W72/04 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04W36/00835 (US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,US);
H04W36/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NUTZUNG STRAHLSPEZIFISCHER ZELLINDIVIDUELLER OFFSETS IN EINEM BENUTZERGERÄT | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD FOR UTILIZING BEAM-SPECIFIC CELL-INDIVIDUAL OFFSETS IN A USER EQUIPMENT | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE DÉCALAGES INDIVIDUELS DE CELLULE SPÉCIFIQUE AU FAISCEAU DANS UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2016150435 (BAEK SANG-KYU [KR], et al); | [XAI]US2018124766 (NAGARAJA SUMEETH [US], et al); | [XI]US2020068462 (ZETTERBERG KRISTINA [SE], et al) |