EP3962390 - ELECTROSURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH NON-LIQUID THERMAL TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Creo Medical Limited Creo House Unit 2 Beaufort Park Beaufort Park Way Chepstow, Wales NP16 5UH / GB | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANCOCK, Christopher Paul c/o Creo Medical Limited Creo House, Unit 2 Beaufort Park Beaufort Park Way Chepstow Wales NP16 5UH / GB | 02 /
BURN, Patrick c/o Creo Medical Limited Creo House, Unit 2 Beaufort Park Beaufort Park Way Chepstow Wales NP16 5UH / GB | [2024/31] |
Former [2022/10] | 01 /
HANCOCK, Christopher Paul c/o Creo Medical Limited Creo House, Unit 2 Beaufort Park Beaufort Park Way Chepstow Wales NP16 5UH / GB | ||
02 /
BURN, Patrick c/o Creo Medical Limited Creo House, Unit 2 Beaufort Park Beaufort Park Way Chepstow Wales NP16 5UH / GB | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20717614.0 | 03.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020EP59625 | Priority number, date | GB20190006011 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201906011 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020221552 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962390 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3962390 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A61B18/1815 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61B1/00087 (KR);
A61B1/018 (KR);
A61B8/0841 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B8/12 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2017/00154 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00005 (GB,KR,US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00047 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00101 (US);
A61B2018/00166 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00446 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00482 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00511 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00529 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00541 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B2018/00589 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/0063 (KR);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00785 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/0091 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00916 (US);
A61B2018/00946 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00982 (KR,US);
A61B2018/1853 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/1869 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT NICHTFLÜSSIGEM WÄRMETRANSFER | [2022/10] | English: | ELECTROSURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH NON-LIQUID THERMAL TRANSFER | [2022/10] | French: | INSTRUMENT ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAL AVEC TRANSFERT THERMIQUE NON LIQUIDE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 25.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5861021 (THOME SCOTT P [US], et al); | [A]EP1055400 (GYRUS MEDICAL LTD [GB]); | [XAI]US2001039416 (MOORMAN JACK W [US], et al); | [XAI]US2005245920 (VITULLO JEFFREY M [US], et al); | [A]US2011077632 (ROSSETTO FRANCESCA [US]); | [XAI]US2011319880 (PRAKASH MANI N [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2012076844 |