EP3941895 - D-METYROSINE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyme, Inc. 1 Pluckemin Way Suite 103 Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUCARO, John 30 W. Kapok Drive Newark, DE 19702 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
ZUCARO, John Newark, DE 19702 / US | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20718090.2 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020US23299 | Priority number, date | US201962822242P | 22.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962822242 P | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020197875 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941895 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/255, C07C227/18, C07C237/20, C07C255/43 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C07C237/20 (EP,IL,KR);
C07C227/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01J21/18 (US);
B01J23/44 (US);
C07C213/08 (KR);
C07C217/56 (KR);
C07C227/42 (KR);
C07C229/36 (IL,KR);
C07C253/08 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/18, C07C229/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | D-METYROSIN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/04] | English: | D-METYROSINE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING SAME | [2022/04] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE D-MÉTYROSINE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 29.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9100270 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]) [X] 4 * example 1 *; | [X]WO2011053835 (ATON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 34,43 * examples *; | [X] - OBRECHT D ET AL, "Novel open-chain and cyclic conformationally constrained (R)- and (S)-.alpha.,.alpha.-disubstituted tyrosine analogs", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 1567 - 1587, XP002008118 [X] 34 * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19950780613 | [I] - IWAO OJIMA ET AL, "New aspects of [beta]-lactam chemistry : [beta]-lactams as chiral bujlding blocks", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, SOCIETE FRANCAISE DE CHIMIE. PARIS, FRANCE, (19870101), no. 5, ISSN 0037-8968, pages 649 - 658, XP009520862 [I] 1-43 * Scheme 5 * | by applicant | - "Prodrugs Revisited: The ''Ad Hoc'' Approach as a Complement to Ligand Design", B. TESTAJ. CALDWELL, Medicinal Research Reviews, John Wiley & Sons, (19960000), vol. 16, pages 233 - 241 |