|
10.04.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Request for delayed grant (upcoming introduction of UPP) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.07.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.08.2021 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
01.07.2021 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.07.2021 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.07.2021 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.02.2021 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.02.2021 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.02.2021 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.02.2021 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.09.2020 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.05.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |