EP3946731 - MEL-TYPE ZEOLITE FOR CONVERTING AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS, PROCESS FOR MAKING AND CATALYTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAID ZEOLITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAI, Wenyih, F. 656 Bellerive Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
PODSIADLO, Paul 17731 Sequoia Kings Drive Humble, TX 77346 / US | 03 /
METZGER, Eric, D. 3101 Smith St., Unit 330 Houston, TX 77006 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Ivy, D. 4 Winthrop Rd. Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 05 /
KHEIR, Ali, A. 1425 Elgin St. Houston, TX 77004 / US | 06 /
ZURLO, Dominick, A. 214 Woodmont Circle Easton, PA 18045 / US | 07 /
KEVILLE, Kathleen, M. 860 Fenway Park Beaumont, TX 77706 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LAI, Wenyih, F. Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | ||
02 /
PODSIADLO, Paul Humble, TX 77346 / US | |||
03 /
METZGER, Eric, D. Houston, TX 77006 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNSON, Ivy, D. Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
05 /
KHEIR, Ali, A. Houston, TX 77004 / US | |||
06 /
ZURLO, Dominick, A. Easton, PA 18045 / US | |||
07 /
KEVILLE, Kathleen, M. Beaumont, TX 77706 / US | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 20718513.3 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24616 | Priority number, date | US201962826215P | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962826215 P | EP20190185755 | 11.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19185755 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205354 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946731 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/40, C01B39/36, B01J35/02, B01J35/10, C07C5/27, B01J35/00, B01J29/80, C07C6/12, C01B39/40 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B01J29/80 (EP,KR,US);
C01B39/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,KR);
B01J35/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/60 (EP,KR);
B01J35/615 (US);
B01J35/617 (US);
B01J35/647 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0009 (US);
B01J37/009 (US);
B01J37/06 (US);
B01J37/082 (US);
B01J37/30 (US);
C07C5/2737 (EP,KR,US);
C07C5/2775 (EP,KR);
B01J2229/16 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,KR);
B01J2229/36 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/72 (US);
C01P2004/03 (US);
C01P2004/04 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2737, C07C15/08 (EP);
C07C5/2775, C07C15/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ZEOLITH VOM MEL-TYP ZUR UMWANDLUNG AROMATISCHER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND KATALYTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE DIESEN ZEOLITH ENTHÄLT | [2022/06] | English: | MEL-TYPE ZEOLITE FOR CONVERTING AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS, PROCESS FOR MAKING AND CATALYTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAID ZEOLITE | [2022/06] | French: | ZÉOLITE DE TYPE MEL POUR LA CONVERSION D'HYDROCARBURES AROMATIQUES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET COMPOSITION CATALYTIQUE COMPRENANT LADITE ZÉOLITE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 20.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]US2016257631 (KUZMANICH GREGORY B [US], et al); | [X]US2018362860 (MCCARTHY STEPHEN J [US], et al); | by applicant | US3354078 | US3709979 | US3804746 | US4108881 | US4526879 | US4941963 | CA1281677 | US5213786 | US5689027 | WO0010944 | US6277355 | US2002082462 | US6448459 | US6504072 | US6689929 | US7915471 | US2011263918 | US2011319688 | US2014350316 | US9012711 | US9156749 | US9205401 | US2015376086 | US2015376087 | US9227891 | US9249068 | US9295970 | US9302953 | US2016101405 | US9321029 | US2016185686 | US9434661 | US2016257631 | US2016264495 | US9708233 | US2017204024 | US2017210683 | US9738573 | US2017297977 | US9890094 | US10010878 |