EP3946964 - SECURITY DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODFREY, John 363 Winterthur Way Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7UQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
GODFREY, John Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7UQ / GB | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20718716.2 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020GB50836 | Priority number, date | GB20190004333 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201904333 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193992 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946964 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/342, B42D25/373, B42D25/387 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B42D25/342 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (GB);
B42D25/387 (EP,US);
B41M3/144 (GB,US);
B42D25/29 (GB);
B42D25/373 (EP);
G07D7/12 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/06] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 14.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008160226 (KAULE WITTICH [DE], et al); | [XAI]US2018154677 (LISTER ADAM [GB], et al) | by applicant | EP0059056 | WO8300659 | US4892336 | WO9427254 | EP0723501 | EP0724519 | EP0860298 | WO0039391 | EP1141480 | WO03054297 | WO03095188 | EP1398174 | WO2004050376 | US6856462 | EP1695121 | WO2011051669 | WO2011051670 | WO2011107782 | WO2011107783 | WO2012027779 | GB20130013362 | GB20130013363 |