EP3938597 - BUILDING AND/OR MATERIAL HANDLING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR GUIDING AND MOVING A WORKING HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Biberach GmbH Memminger Str. 120 88400 Biberach an der Riss / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMBERGER, Robert Schäfflerstr. 4 82293 Mittelstetten/Vogach / DE | 02 /
KÖGL, Martin c/o Liebherr-Werk Biberach GmbH Memminger Straße 120 88400 Biberach an der Riß / DE | [2023/17] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
BRAMBERGER, Robert 82293 Mittelstetten/Vogach / DE | ||
02 /
KÖGL, Martin 88400 Biberach an der Riß / DE | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20719127.1 | 02.04.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP59351 | Priority number, date | DE201910109019 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019109019 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201400 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938597 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3938597 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B66C13/48, B66C23/00, E04G21/04, B66C23/30, B66C17/06, B33Y30/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
E04G21/0427 (EP,US);
B66C23/42 (CN);
B28B1/001 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
B66C11/04 (CN);
B66C13/48 (EP,US);
B66C17/06 (EP,US);
B66C23/283 (US);
B66C23/30 (EP,CN);
B66C23/62 (CN);
B66C23/701 (CN);
B66C23/708 (CN);
B66C23/828 (CN);
B66C23/84 (CN);
E04G21/04 (CN);
E04G21/0463 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | E04G21/04, B33Y30/00, B66C17/06, B66C23/18, B66C23/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAU- UND/ODER MATERIALUMSCHLAGSMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM FÜHREN UND BEWEGEN EINES ARBEITSKOPFS | [2022/03] | English: | BUILDING AND/OR MATERIAL HANDLING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR GUIDING AND MOVING A WORKING HEAD | [2022/03] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION ET/OU DE MANUTENTION DE MATÉRIAU AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ POUR GUIDER ET DÉPLACER UNE TÊTE DE TRAVAIL | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 12.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23169116.3 / EP4239144 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | PL | 26.04.2023 | |
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 26.04.2023 | |
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 28.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3223169 (WUERTH GUSTAV DIPL KFM DR); | [A]FR2967526 (VAYSSADE FABRICE [FR]); | [A]KR20190014287 (UNIV SEJONG IND ACAD COOP FOUD [KR]); | [A]CN106401194B | by applicant | US8029710 | WO2015135645 | US2018345533 | CN109129819 |