Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3946622 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CA3135836 CN202080040939 CN202411950244 EP20720302 IL28683821 JP2021560478 JP2024206358 KR20217035131 US2020025936W US202016836006

More

US202217811586



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023340123Global Dossier 26.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202016836006 31.03.2020
US201962827744 01.04.2019
US202217811586 10.07.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11384146Global Dossier 12.07.2022B2
US2020325230 15.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US202016836006 31.03.2020
US201962827744 01.04.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20220047536Global Dossier 18.04.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2025041629Global Dossier 26.03.2025A
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
JP2021560478 31.03.2020
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7596298BGlobal Dossier 09.12.2024B2
JP2022528005 07.06.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL286838Global Dossier 31.10.2021A
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN119735682Global Dossier 01.04.2025A
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
CN202080040939 31.03.2020
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN114585416BGlobal Dossier 17.01.2025B
CN114585416 03.06.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3135836Global Dossier 08.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3946622Global Dossier 09.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019
WO2020US25936 31.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020205849Global Dossier 08.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962827744 01.04.2019