EP3938702 - UNIFORMLY ILLUMINABLE DECORATIVE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIB Trim Part Solutions GmbH Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 21-25 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Zhikai Kaiserstrasse 23 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
YU, Zhikai 76646 Bruchsal / DE | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20720396.9 | 15.04.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP60553 | Priority number, date | DE201910111542 | 03.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019111542 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020224923 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938702 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3938702 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21S4/22, F21S4/28, F21V31/04, B60Q3/54, B60Q3/78, // F21Y103/10, F21Y105/12, F21Y115/10, F21W104/00 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
F21V31/04 (EP);
B60Q3/54 (EP);
B60Q3/78 (EP);
F21S4/22 (EP);
F21S4/28 (EP);
F21W2104/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | F21S4/22, F21S4/28, F21V31/04, B60Q3/78, F21Y103/10, F21Y105/12, F21Y115/10, F21W104/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHMÄSSIG BELEUCHTBARES ZIERTEIL | [2023/34] | English: | UNIFORMLY ILLUMINABLE DECORATIVE PART | [2022/03] | French: | PIÈCE DÉCORATIVE POUVANT ÊTRE ÉCLAIRÉE DE MANIÈRE RÉGULIÈRE | [2022/03] |
Former [2022/03] | GLEICHMÄßIG BELEUCHTBARES ZIERTEIL | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 27.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10343878 (CARL CROON GMBH & CO KG BAUELE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2009244902 (GRAHAM MORTON [GB]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0019] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2011063838 (DAU WILSON [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2011156067 (LIN JHIH-HAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036]; figures 4,5,8A,8B *; | [A]US2014307434 (YE ZHI-TING [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0031]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2018017231 (SHIH SHOU-JEN [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figures 3,4 * |