EP4135901 - MILLING TRACK SEGMENT SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/08] | KEY MILLING PLATE SEGMENT, MILLING PLATE SEGMENT SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR SAME | ||
[2024/02] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loesche GmbH Hansaallee 243 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTENWORTH, Jörg c/o Loesche GmbH Hansaallee 243 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KEYSSNER, Michael c/o Loesche GmbH Hansaallee 243 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/08] | 01 /
BETTENWORTH, Jörg c/o LOESCHE GmbH Hansaallee 243 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
KEYSSNER, Michael c/o LOESCHE GmbH Hansaallee 243 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/08] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20720400.9 | 16.04.2020 | [2023/08] | WO2020EP60674 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021209133 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135901 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4135901 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B02C15/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B02C15/003 (EP,US);
B02C2210/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 06.10.2022 | Title | German: | MAHLTELLERSEGMENTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN HIERZU | [2024/02] | English: | MILLING TRACK SEGMENT SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2024/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SEGMENTS DE PLATEAU DE BROYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2024/02] |
Former [2023/08] | SCHLÜSSEL-MAHLTELLERSEGMENT, MAHLTELLERSEGMENTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN HIERZU | ||
Former [2023/08] | KEY MILLING PLATE SEGMENT, MILLING PLATE SEGMENT SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR SAME | ||
Former [2023/08] | SEGMENT DE PLAQUE DE FRAISAGE À CLÉ, SYSTÈME DE SEGMENT DE PLAQUE DE FRAISAGE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 06.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB761696 (BERNARD MANN); | [A]US3366338 (BARTON FRANCIS M); | [X]DE8204278U ; | [A]FR2615409 (MAGOTTEAUX SA [BE], et al) | by applicant | DE1507580 | DE1507629 |